Pitlor v. Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.

Plaintiff: David Pitlor
Defendant: Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv00095
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Susan M Bazis
2 Judge: Robert F Rossiter
3 Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY BRIEF in support of MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings #10 by Attorney Victoria H. Buter on behalf of Defendant Charles Schwab & Co., Inc..(Buter, Victoria)
April 11, 2019 Filing 15 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings #10 on behalf of Plaintiff David Pitlor. (LKO)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. The deadline for answering or responding to Plaintiff's complaint is stayed pending the ruling on Schwab's Motion to Compel arbitration. If the court rules that this case will not be submitted to arbitration, Schwab's answer or response shall be filed on or before ten days following that ruling.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
March 29, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Victoria H. Buter on behalf of Defendant Charles Schwab & Co., Inc..(Buter, Victoria)
March 29, 2019 Filing 12 INDEX in support of MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings #10 by Attorney Victoria H. Buter on behalf of Defendant Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Patricia Goeke, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Buter, Victoria)
March 29, 2019 Filing 11 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings #10 by Attorney Victoria H. Buter on behalf of Defendant Charles Schwab & Co., Inc..(Buter, Victoria)
March 29, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Attorney Victoria H. Buter on behalf of Defendant Charles Schwab & Co., Inc..(Buter, Victoria)
March 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Thomas H. Dahlk on behalf of Defendant Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. (Dahlk, Thomas)
March 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Joshua S. Weiner on behalf of Defendant Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. (Weiner, Joshua)
March 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Victoria H. Buter on behalf of Defendant Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. (Buter, Victoria)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REASSIGNMENT ORDER - that this case is reassigned to Senior District Judge Joseph F. Bataillon for disposition and to Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart for judicial supervision. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (LKO)
March 13, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. on 3/8/2019. (LKO)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued (COPY) as to defendant Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. Original given to plaintiff for service. (LKO)
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. One Blank summons form given to plaintiff. (TCL)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (TCL)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. No Summons issued, with receipt number 8050943, in the amount of $ 400 on behalf of David Pitlor (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Supplementary Attachment 1, #8 Supplementary Attachment 2)(TCL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pitlor v. Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Pitlor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.
Represented By: Thomas H. Dahlk
Represented By: Joshua S. Weiner
Represented By: Victoria H. Buter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?