Ametitovi v. Omaha Area Health Educational Center, Inc. et al
Case Number: 8:2019cv00181
Filed: April 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER that the magistrate judge's Findings and Recommendation (Filing No. 12 ) are accepted. This case is dismissed without prejudice. A separate judgment will issue. Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (JSF)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION - to Robert F. Rossiter, Jr., United States District Court Judge, that the above-captioned case be dismissed for failure of service pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - that Plaintiff shall have until August 27, 2019, to show cause why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) or for want of prosecution. The failure to timely comply with this order may result in dismissal of this action without further notice. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff may proceed in this matter without prepaying fees or costs. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (CS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ametitovi v. Omaha Area Health Educational Center, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?