Summit Fire Protection Co. v. Reich

Case Number: 8:2019cv00188
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 PROTECTIVE ORDER - Upon consideration of the parties' joint request for entry of a Protective Order, (Filing No. 21 ), the Court enters the following Protective Order governing the disclosure of confidential Discovery Material by a Producing Party to a Receiving Party in this Action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 AMENDED ORDER - The clerk shall add Total Fire and Security, Inc. as an interested third party in this case, with John P. Passarelli identified as Total Fire's counsel for this action. After this order is filed, the clerk shall re-generate the N otice of Electronic filing to assure Mr. Passarelli receives a copy of this order and of the related audio file, (Filing No. 30 ). Plaintiff's motion for expedited discovery, (Filing No. [16), is resolved as follows: Counsel for the parties and for third-party Total Fire shall immediately meet and confer to resolve any remaining discovery issues and to select an agreed upon computer forensics examiner and search terms for inspecting Reich's computer storage devices and Total Fire' ;s servers. All discovery responses shall be served on or before June 24, 2019, and If any discovery dispute remains between Total Fire and Plaintiff as of June 24, 2019, Total Fire shall file its response to Plaintiff's motion to compel, (Filin g No. 26 ), on or before June 27, 2019; If any objections to producing discovery, including third party discovery, remain as of June 24, 2019, the parties shall immediately schedule a conference call with the undersigned magistrate judge to obtain r ulings on those objections on the record; and Absent receiving notice before June 28, 2019 that discovery disputes remain, Plaintiff's motion to compel, (Filing No. 26 ), will be denied as moot. This matter remains scheduled for a July 15, 2019 hearing on the motion for preliminary injunction. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, within ECF No. 6 , filed by Plaintiff Summit Fire Protection Co. is denied. The Clerk of Court is directed to designate the Motion for Preliminary Injunction, within ECF No. 6 , as still pending. Ordered by Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (LKO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Summit Fire Protection Co. v. Reich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?