Vlach et al v. United States
Petitioner: Daniel W Vlach, Amy N Marrs, Daniel W. Vlach and Amy N. Marrs
Respondent: United States
Case Number: 8:2019cv00198
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: John M Gerrard
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits: IRS-Third Party
Cause of Action: 26:7609
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant United States. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt and Green Card)(McGill, Gretchen)
May 29, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant United States. (McGill, Gretchen)
May 20, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to respondent United States. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Requested as to United States regarding Motion to Quash,, #1 . (McGill, Gretchen)
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Requested as to United States regarding Motion to Quash,, #1 . (McGill, Gretchen)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to defendant United States. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt and Green Card)(McGill, Gretchen)
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting Application for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically #5 . Filing fee in the amount of $400.00 receipt number ANEDC-393077 is refunded to the payor Gretchen McGill.Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (DKM)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Refund of filing fee paid electronically by Attorney Gretchen L. McGill on behalf of Petitioners Amy N. Marrs, Daniel W. Vlach.(McGill, Gretchen)
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to respondent United States. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to United States regarding Motion to Quash,, #1 . (McGill, Gretchen)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Quash Summons ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3930869), by Attorney Gretchen L. McGill on behalf of Daniel W Vlach, Amy N Marrs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Financial Records Summonses, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Summary of Taxpayer Contact, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - 10/18/18 Correspondence from Respondent to Vlach, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - 10/18/18 First Final Notice, #5 Exhibit Ex. E - 10/29/18 Second Final Notice, #6 Exhibit Ex. F - 11/26/18 Petitioners' Second CDP Request)(McGill, Gretchen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vlach et al v. United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daniel W Vlach
Represented By: Gretchen L. McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Amy N Marrs
Represented By: Gretchen L. McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daniel W. Vlach
Represented By: Gretchen L. McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Amy N. Marrs
Represented By: Gretchen L. McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?