Alspaugh v. Nebraska Department of Corrections

Plaintiff: Clarence Eugene Alspaugh, III
Defendant: Nebraska Department of Corrections
Case Number: 8:2019cv00217
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Referring Judge: Richard G Kopf
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 12 LETTER on behalf of Plaintiff Clarence Eugene Alspaugh, III.(TCL)
July 12, 2019 TEXT ENTRY THAT FILING fee paid on behalf of Clarence Alspaugh on 7/12/19. Receipt number 8052529, in the amount of $ 349.00. (ADB)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time to Pay Filing Fee (filing no. #10 ) is granted. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $70.96 on or before July 26, 2019, unless the court extends the time in which he has to pay in response to a written motion. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff's institution must collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and forward those payments to the court. The clerk's office is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: July 26, 2019: initial partial filing fee payment due. The clerk's office is also directed to term the June 28, 2019, pro se case management deadline. Plaintiff is advised that, following payment of the initial partial filing fee, the next step in Plaintiff's case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of Plaintiff's claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party and plaintiff's institution)(LKO)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Extend time to pay filing fee on behalf of Plaintiff Clarence Eugene Alspaugh, III. (LKO)
June 10, 2019 Filing 9 PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Plaintiff Clarence Eugene Alspaugh, III. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (LKO)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP (Filing No. #2 ) is granted. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $70.96 within 30 days, unless the court extends the time in which he has to pay in response to a written motion. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff's institution must collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and forward those payments to the court. The clerk's office is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: June 28, 2019: initial partial filing fee payment due. Plaintiff is advised that, following payment of the initial partial filing fee, the next step in Plaintiff's case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of Plaintiff's claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Plaintiff Clarence Eugene Alspaugh, III. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (TCL)
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER by Clerk requesting plaintiff's trust account statement from institution. Copy mailed to Bruce Hunzeker at Nebraska Department of Correctional Services. (LKO)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 GENERAL ORDER NO. 2016-02: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Plaintiff Clarence Eugene Alspaugh, III. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (LKO)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Clarence Eugene Alspaugh, III. (LKO)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nebraska Department of Corrections filed on behalf of pro se plaintiff Clarence Eugene Alspaugh, III. (LKO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alspaugh v. Nebraska Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Eugene Alspaugh, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nebraska Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?