Golden v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Kevin Golden
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 8:2019cv00219
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: John M Gerrard
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - The deposition deadline is May 1, 2020. The jury trial of this case is set to commence before John M. Gerrard, Chief United States District Judge, in the Special Proceedings Courtroom, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska, at 9:00 a.m. on August 31, 2020, or as soon thereafter as the case may be called, for a duration of three (3) trial days. The Pretrial Conference is scheduled before the undersigned magistrate judge on August 14, 2020, at 10:00 a.m., and will be conducted in chambers. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (KLF)
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Rex A. Rezac on behalf of Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Rezac, Rex)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting 8 Oral Motion. The deadlines for the Rule 26 Meeting Report and mandatory disclosures are reset for July 8, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (JLM)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ORAL MOTION - by counsel for Defendant requesting an extension of the deadline to file the Rule 26(f) Meeting Report and the deadline for filing mandatory disclosures. (JLM)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RESTRICTED CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (KLF)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 6/24/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (KLF)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Rezac, Rex)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Rex A. Rezac on behalf of Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Rezac, Rex)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(CS)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against Kevin Golden from District Court of Douglas County, Nebraska, Case number CI19-3047 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3940368) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Rex A. Rezac on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint and Praecipe, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Michael Roper, #3 Exhibit District Court Pleadings)(Rezac, Rex)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Golden v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Rex A. Rezac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Golden
Represented By: Matthew G. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?