Pineda v. Kellogg USA, Inc.

Plaintiff: Sandra Pineda
Defendant: Kellogg USA, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv00221
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: John M Gerrard
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Intent to Serve Subpoena Duces Tecum by Attorney Raymond R. Aranza on behalf of Plaintiff Sandra Pineda (Aranza, Raymond)
July 10, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Intent to Serve Subpoena Duces Tecum by Attorney Raymond R. Aranza on behalf of Plaintiff Sandra Pineda (Aranza, Raymond)
July 8, 2019 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Kellogg Company for Kellogg USA, Inc.. Defendant's Corrected Corporate Disclosure by Attorney Jennifer J. Stocker on behalf of Defendants Kellogg USA, Inc., Kellogg Company.(Stocker, Jennifer)
July 3, 2019 Filing 16 Certificate of Service on Defendant's 26(a)(1)(A) Initial Disclosures by Attorney Jennifer J. Stocker on behalf of Defendant Kellogg USA, Inc..(Stocker, Jennifer)
June 24, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #12 and Affirmative Defenses by Kellogg USA, Inc. (Stocker, Jennifer)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 7/15/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
June 12, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by Kellogg USA, Inc. (Stocker, Jennifer)
June 11, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT with with jury demand against Defendant Kellogg USA, Inc., by Attorney Raymond R. Aranza on behalf of Sandra Pineda(Aranza, Raymond)
May 23, 2019 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting the Application for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically #4 . Filing fee in the amount of $400.00 is refunded to the payor, Catherine Stegman, receipt number ANEDC-3940629. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (DKM)
May 23, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Kellogg USA, Inc. for Kellogg USA, Inc.. by Attorney Jennifer J. Stocker on behalf of Defendants Kellogg USA, Inc., Kellogg USA, Inc..(Stocker, Jennifer)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant's answer or response to Plaintiff's complaint shall be filed on or before June 21, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #7 for attorney Jennifer Stocker. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-3942059 by Attorney Jennifer J. Stocker on behalf of Defendant Kellogg USA, Inc..(Stocker, Jennifer)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate regarding MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading #5 by Attorney Catherine L. Stegman on behalf of Defendant Kellogg USA, Inc..(Stegman, Catherine)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Catherine L. Stegman on behalf of Defendant Kellogg USA, Inc..(Stegman, Catherine)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Refund of filing fee paid electronically by Attorney Catherine L. Stegman on behalf of Defendant Kellogg USA, Inc..(Stegman, Catherine)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Kellogg USA, Inc.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against Sandra Pineda from District Court of Douglas County, Nebraska, Case number CI 19-3002 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3940649) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Catherine L. Stegman on behalf of Kellogg USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Stegman, Catherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pineda v. Kellogg USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellogg USA, Inc.
Represented By: Catherine L. Stegman
Represented By: Jennifer J. Stocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Pineda
Represented By: Raymond R. Aranza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?