NewStar Sourcing and Service, LLC v. Patee et al

Plaintiff: NewStar Sourcing and Service, LLC
Defendant: Consumers Supply Distributing, LLC, David Patee and Daniel Patee
Case Number: 8:2019cv00226
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Consumers Supply Distributing, LLC on 5/31/2019. (Barry, Andre)
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Daniel Patee on 6/5/2019. (Barry, Andre)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Daniel Patee and David Patee shall file an Answer or other responsive pleading on or before July 22, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CEW)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Daniel L. Hartnett on behalf of Defendants Daniel Patee, David Patee.(Hartnett, Daniel)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Defendant Consumers Supply Distributing LLC's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Consumers Supply Distributing, LLC shall file an Answer or other responsive pleading on or before July 22, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CEW)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Patrick S. Cooper on behalf of Defendant Consumers Supply Distributing, LLC.(Cooper, Patrick)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Circle "S" Ranch, Inc. for NewStar Sourcing and Service, LLC. by Attorney Michael S. Dove on behalf of Plaintiffs NewStar Sourcing and Service, LLC, Circle "S" Ranch, Inc..(Dove, Michael)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to defendants Consumers Supply Distributing, LLC, Daniel Patee, and David Patee. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff NewStar Sourcing and Service, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Michael S. Dove has not paid the biennial assessment. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to David Patee, Daniel Patee, and Consumers Supply Distributing, LLC regarding Complaint #1 . (Dove, Michael)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3942580), by Attorney Michael S. Dove on behalf of NewStar Sourcing and Service, LLC(Dove, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NewStar Sourcing and Service, LLC v. Patee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consumers Supply Distributing, LLC
Represented By: Patrick S. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Patee
Represented By: Daniel L. Hartnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Patee
Represented By: Daniel L. Hartnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NewStar Sourcing and Service, LLC
Represented By: Megan S. Wright
Represented By: Andre R. Barry
Represented By: Michael S. Dove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?