Mumin

Plaintiff: Dukhan Mumin
Case Number: 8:2019cv00228
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Referring Judge: Richard G Kopf
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 JUDGMENT - This case is dismissed without prejudice for the reasons set forth in the corresponding Memorandum and Order entered on this date. Any notice of appeal filed by Plaintiff Dukhan Mumin must be accompanied by the $505.00 appellate filing fee because Plaintiff will not be allowed to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. (Attachments: #1 Notice - Civil Appeals in Pro Se Cases) Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (filing no. #2 ) is denied. This case is dismissed without prejudice and a separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Any notice of appeal filed by Plaintiff must be accompanied by the $505.00 appellate filing fee because Plaintiff will not be allowed to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The court's Memorandum and Order granting Plaintiff leave to proceed IFP (filing no. #7 ) is vacated as it was entered in error. Plaintiff has 30 days to either show cause for why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g) or pay the court's $400.00 filing and administrative fees. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: July 8, 2019: deadline for Plaintiff to show cause or pay fees. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party and plaintiff's institution)(LKO)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 *VACATED* ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP (Filing No. #2 ) is granted. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $.03 within 30 days, unless the court extends the time in which he has to pay in response to a written motion. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff's institution must collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and forward those payments to the court. The clerk's office is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: July 8, 2019: initial partial filing fee payment due. Plaintiff is advised that, following payment of the initial partial filing fee, the next step in Plaintiffs case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of Plaintiff's claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party and plaintiff's institution)(LKO) Modified on 6/6/2019 to vacate per memorandum and order #8 (LKO).
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Plaintiff Dukhan Mumin. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (LKO)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER by Clerk requesting plaintiff's trust account statement from institution. Copy mailed to Bruce Hunzeker at Nebraska Department of Correctional Services. (LKO)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 GENERAL ORDER NO. 2016-02: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Dukhan Mumin. (LKO)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed on behalf of pro se plaintiff Dukhan Mumin. (LKO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mumin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dukhan Mumin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?