Zawaideh v. The Standard Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Ziad L. Zawaideh
Defendant: The Standard Insurance Company
Case Number: 8:2019cv00235
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Michael D Nelson
Referring Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding discovery material. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (ADB)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - Depositions due 1/15/20. Non-Jury Trial set for 7/13/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Judge Robert F. Rossiter Jr.. Pretrial Conference set for 6/26/2020 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. Telephone Conference set for 2/21/2020 at 10:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (ADB)
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Natalie M. Hein on behalf of Plaintiff Ziad L. Zawaideh.(Hein, Natalie)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Service by Attorney Natalie M. Hein on behalf of Plaintiff Ziad L. Zawaideh.(Hein, Natalie)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (KMM)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 7/8/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (KMM)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by The Standard Insurance Company (Wagener, Terrance)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent StanCorp Financial Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Meiji Yasuda Life Insurance Company for The Standard Insurance Company. by Attorney Terrance J. Wagener on behalf of Defendants The Standard Insurance Company, StanCorp Financial Group, Inc., Meiji Yasuda Life Insurance Company.(Wagener, Terrance)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant The Standard Insurance Company. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(TCL)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (TCL)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Ziad L. Zawaideh from District Court of Sarpy County NE, Case number CI 19-839 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3947815) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Terrance J. Wagener on behalf of The Standard Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- State Court Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wagener, Terrance)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zawaideh v. The Standard Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Standard Insurance Company
Represented By: Katie D. Figgins
Represented By: Terrance J. Wagener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ziad L. Zawaideh
Represented By: Natalie M. Hein
Represented By: Daniel J. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?