Davis v. Countryside Village, Inc.
Plaintiff: Melanie Davis
Defendant: Countryside Village, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv00245
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 8/15/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Countryside Village, Inc. (Pohren, Edward)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - that upon consideration of Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint, the Motion is hereby GRANTED. Countryside Village, Inc., shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before July 16, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Edward F. Pohren has not paid the biennial assessment. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (KLF)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Edward F. Pohren on behalf of Defendant Countryside Village, Inc..(Pohren, Edward)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Countryside Village, Inc. for Countryside Village, Inc.. by Attorney Edward F. Pohren on behalf of Defendants Countryside Village, Inc., Countryside Village, Inc..(Pohren, Edward)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Edward F. Pohren on behalf of Defendant Countryside Village, Inc. (Pohren, Edward)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to defendant Countryside Village, Inc. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to Countryside Village, Inc. regarding Complaint, #1 . (Browne, Padraigin)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Countryside Village, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3953375), by Attorney Padraigin L. Browne on behalf of Melanie Davis (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Browne, Padraigin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Countryside Village, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countryside Village, Inc.
Represented By: Edward F. Pohren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Davis
Represented By: Padraigin L. Browne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?