Franklin v. Fort Plaza Baceline, LLC
Plaintiff: Sandra Franklin
Defendant: Fort Plaza Baceline, LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv00256
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Susan M Bazis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LAC)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 9/6/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LAC)
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Fort Plaza Baceline, LLC (Pohren, Edward)
July 26, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Edward F. Pohren on behalf of Defendant Fort Plaza Baceline, LLC.(Pohren, Edward)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by August 5, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Fort Plaza Baceline, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(ADB)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Edward F. Pohren on behalf of Defendant Fort Plaza Baceline, LLC.(Pohren, Edward)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Edward F. Pohren on behalf of Defendant Fort Plaza Baceline, LLC (Pohren, Edward)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to defendant Fort Plaza Baceline, LLC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to Fort Plaza Baceline, LLC regarding Complaint #1 . (Zwilling, Edward)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Request For Place Of Trial by Attorney Edward I. Zwilling on behalf of Plaintiff Sandra Franklin (Zwilling, Edward)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fort Plaza Baceline, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3959376), by Attorney Edward I. Zwilling on behalf of Sandra Franklin(Zwilling, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franklin v. Fort Plaza Baceline, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Franklin
Represented By: Edward I. Zwilling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fort Plaza Baceline, LLC
Represented By: Edward F. Pohren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?