Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Elite Lounge & Grille, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Elite Lounge & Grille, Inc., Douglas R. Steffensmeier and Tommy Nguyen
Case Number: 8:2019cv00265
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:553
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Elite Lounge & Grille, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(CS)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 9/4/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 Defendants' ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Complaint, #1 by Elite Lounge & Grille, Inc., Tommy Nguyen, Douglas R. Steffensmeier (Pirsch, Perry)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Elite Lounge & Grille, Inc. on 7/11/2019; Tommy Nguyen on 7/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Janis, Ryan)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to defendants Elite Lounge & Grille, Inc., Tommy Nguyen and Douglas R. Steffensmeier. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to Elite Lounge & Grill, Inc., Tommy Nguyen, and Douglas R. Steffensmeier regarding Complaint, #1 . (Janis, Ryan)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Ryan R. Janis on behalf of Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions, Inc..(Janis, Ryan)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Elite Lounge & Grille, Inc., Tommy Nguyen, Douglas R. Steffensmeier ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3962488), by Attorney Ryan R. Janis on behalf of Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Janis, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Elite Lounge & Grille, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elite Lounge & Grille, Inc.
Represented By: Perry A. Pirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas R. Steffensmeier
Represented By: Perry A. Pirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy Nguyen
Represented By: Perry A. Pirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan R. Janis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?