Martinez v. Lancaster Department of Corrections
Petitioner: Juan Manuel Gonzalez Martinez
Respondent: Lancaster Department of Corrections
Case Number: 8:2019cv00268
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Referring Judge: Richard G Kopf
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 JUDGMENT - PRO SE that the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (and any amendments or supplements thereto) is denied and dismissed without prejudice. No certificate of appealability has been or will be issued. (Attachments: #1 Notice - Civil Appeals in Pro Se Cases) Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party as directed to Diagnostic and Evaluation Center, 3220 West Van Dorn Street, PO Box 22800, Lincoln, NE 68542)(ADB)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the petition for writ of habeas corpus and all supplements filed under 28 U.S.C. 2241 is dismissed without prejudice. A separate judgment will be entered. No certificate of appealability has been or will be issued. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party as directed to Diagnostic and Evaluation Center, Nebraska Department of Correctional Services, 3220 West Van Dorn Street, P.O. Box 22800, Lincoln, NE 68542-2800) (ADB)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Filing No. #4 ) is granted. The next step in this case is for the court to conduct a preliminary review of the habeas corpus petition in accordance with Rule 4 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 cases. The court will conduct this review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 PRISONER ACCOUNT CERTIFICATE by Petitioner Juan Manuel Gonzalez Martinez. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (LKO)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER by Clerk requesting plaintiff's trust account statement from institution. Letter sent to Angie Koziol at Lancaster County Corrections. (LKO)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Petitioner Juan Manuel Gonzalez Martinez. (LKO)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT on behalf of Petitioner Juan Manuel Gonzalez Martinez. (per pro se with english translation). (LKO)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Petitioner is directed to submit the $5.00 fee to the clerk's office or submit a request to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days. Failure to take either action will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. The clerk of the court is directed to send to Petitioner the Form AO240 ("Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit"). The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: July 24, 2019: Check for MIFP or payment. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed on behalf of pro se petitioner Juan Manuel Gonzalez Martinez. (Page 4 missing when received) (LKO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Lancaster Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Juan Manuel Gonzalez Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lancaster Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?