Shaw v. Dana F. Cole Company, LLP
Plaintiff: Mary Shaw
Defendant: Dana F. Cole Company, LLP and Dana F. Cole & Company, LLP
Case Number: 8:2019cv00275
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - Pursuant to the notice of dismissal with prejudice, Filing No. #7 , this case is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own fees and costs associated with this action. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Case Dismissal by Attorney Erik W. Fern on behalf of Plaintiff Mary Shaw (Fern, Erik)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Jessica C. Kallstrom-Schreckengost on behalf of Defendant Dana F. Cole Company, LLP.(Kallstrom-Schreckengost, Jessica)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting 4 Email Motion. The deadline for Defendant to file a responsive pleading is extended to August 15, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (JLM)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT EMAIL MOTION - by counsel for Defendant requesting an extension of the deadline to file a responsive pleading. (JLM)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL Defendant's Amended Notice of and Petition for Removal against Dana F. Cole Company, LLP from In the District Court of Lancaster County, Nebraska, Case number 19-1163 with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Jessica C. Kallstrom-Schreckengost on behalf of Dana F. Cole Company, LLP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kallstrom-Schreckengost, Jessica) Modified on 6/26/2019 to add "amended" per attorney request. (JAB)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Defendant's Notice of and Petition for Removal against Mary Shaw from In the District Court of Lancaster County, Nebraska, Case number CI19-1143 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3965747) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Jessica C. Kallstrom-Schreckengost on behalf of Dana F. Cole Company, LLP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kallstrom-Schreckengost, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shaw v. Dana F. Cole Company, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana F. Cole Company, LLP
Represented By: Jessica C. Kallstrom-Schreckengost
Represented By: Christopher E. Hoyme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana F. Cole & Company, LLP
Represented By: Jessica C. Kallstrom-Schreckengost
Represented By: Christopher E. Hoyme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Shaw
Represented By: Erik W. Fern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?