Thomas v. CPL Caliri et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Chance Dupree Thomas
Defendant: CPL Caliri, Michelle Capps, Scott Frakes and Shawn Shores
Case Number: 8:2019cv00278
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Referring Judge: Richard G Kopf
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 TEXT ENTRY THAT PARTIAL FILING fee paid on behalf of Kevin Chance Dupree Thomas on 08/15/2019. Receipt number 8053007, in the amount of $9.00. (KLF)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for extension of time (Filing #8 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension on behalf of Plaintiff Kevin Chance Dupree Thomas.(TCL)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff will have 30 days to show cause why this case should not bedismissed for failure to pay the initial partial filing fee. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: September 3, 2019: check for response to show cause order. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (ADB)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP (filing no. #2 ) is granted. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $6.03 within 30 days, unless the court extends the time in which he has to pay in response to a written motion. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff's institution must collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and forward those payments to the court. The clerk's office is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: July 29, 2019: initial partial filing fee payment due. Plaintiff is advised that, following payment of the initial partial filing fee, the next step in Plaintiff's case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of Plaintiff's claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party and plaintiff's institution) (LKO)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 GENERAL ORDER NO. 2016-02: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Plaintiff Kevin Chance Dupree Thomas ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (LKO)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Kevin Chance Dupree Thomas.(LKO)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CPL Caliri, Michelle Capps, Scott Frakes, and Shawn Shores filed on behalf of pro se plaintiff Kevin Chance Dupree Thomas. (4 Exact copies received) (LKO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. CPL Caliri et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CPL Caliri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Capps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Frakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Shores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Chance Dupree Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?