Levine v. PayPal, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tara Levine
Defendant: PayPal, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv00281
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: John M Gerrard
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - The parties' Joint Stipulation to Proceed to Arbitration (Filing No. #11 ) is granted. This case is stayed pending arbitration. Plaintiff shall initiate arbitration proceedings through JAMS no later than September 22, 2019. PayPal shall pay the filing fee required by JAMS in this arbitration. Beginning November 22, 2019, and every 90-days thereafter, the parties shall file a status report advising the Court of the status of the arbitration proceedings. The Clerk shall terminate all other outstanding deadlines in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 JOINT STIPULATION to Proceed to Arbitration by Attorney Susan K. Tvrdy on behalf of Defendant PayPal, Inc..(Tvrdy, Susan)
August 21, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Susan K. Tvrdy on behalf of Defendant PayPal, Inc. (Tvrdy, Susan)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting 8 Joint Email Motion. The Rule 26(f) Meeting Report deadline is extended to August 22, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 JOINT TEXT EMAIL MOTION - by counsel for the parties requesting an extension of time to file the Rule 26(f) Report. (SMN)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent PayPal Holdings, Inc. for PayPal, Inc.. by Attorney George E. Martin, III on behalf of Defendants PayPal, Inc., PayPal Holdings, Inc..(Martin, George)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 8/8/2019.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 PayPal's ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by PayPal, Inc. (Martin, George)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant PayPal, Inc.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Tara Levine from DISTRICT COURT OF SARPY COUNTY, NEBRASKA, Case number CI 19-244 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3967546) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney George E. Martin, III on behalf of PayPal, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Martin, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Levine v. PayPal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Levine
Represented By: Jennifer L. Turco Meyer
Represented By: Michael J. Dyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PayPal, Inc.
Represented By: George E. Martin, III
Represented By: Susan K. Tvrdy
Represented By: Heidi A. Guttau-Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?