Standifer v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Larry E. Standifer
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 8:2019cv00285
Filed: June 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Serving Discovery by Attorney John M. Walker on behalf of Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company (Walker, John)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RESTRICTED CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (KLF)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROGRESSION ORDER - A telephonic conference to discuss the status of case progression and the parties' interest in settlement will be held with the undersigned magistrate judge on December 30, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. by telephone. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. Absent a later court order vacating the settlement conference setting, a half-day settlement conference will be held on January 28, 2021 at 9:00 a.m., in the Special Proceedings Courtroom, Omaha, Nebraska. The deposition deadline is December 28, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (KLF)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Union Pacific Corporation for Union Pacific Railroad Company. by Attorney John M. Walker on behalf of Defendants Union Pacific Railroad Company, Union Pacific Corporation.(Walker, John)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by Union Pacific Railroad Company (Walker, John)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company on 7/8/2019. (Sassaman, Shawn)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to Plaintiff regarding Complaint #1 . (Sassaman, Shawn)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
June 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Union Pacific Railroad Company ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number NEDC-3969195), by Attorney Shawn M. Sassaman on behalf of Larry Standifer (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sassaman, Shawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Standifer v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: John M. Walker
Represented By: Anne M. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry E. Standifer
Represented By: Shawn M. Sassaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?