Nehls v. State of Nebraska

Petitioner: Richard Nehis and Richard Nehls
Respondent: State of Nebraska
Interested Party: Nebraska Attorney General
Case Number: 8:2019cv00287
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Referring Judge: Richard G Kopf
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 16 COPY of Order from USCA - 8th Circuit (19-2511) Richard Nehls's motion for appointment of counsel is hereby ordered taken with the case for consideration by the panel to which this case is submitted for disposition on the merits. (LKO)
July 19, 2019 Filing 15 COPY of Order from USCA - 8th Circuit (19-2511) If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, CDs, videos, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. (LKO)
July 19, 2019 Filing 14 Letter by Clerk of USCA - 8th Circuit (19-2511) regarding Notice of Appeal to USCA #10 . (Attachments: #1 Pro Se NDA) (LKO)
July 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL AND NOA SUPPLEMENT by Clerk to USCA regarding Notice of Appeal to USCA #8 , Notice of Appeal to USCA #10 , Memorandum and Order #6 , Judgment - Pro Se #7 , and Order granting IFP #12 . Notice of Appeal filed on 7/12/19 by Petitioner Richard Nehls. (LKO)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - that Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Appeal in Forma Pauperis (filing no. #11 ) is granted. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis on behalf of Petitioner Richard Nehls. (LKO)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEAL regarding Memorandum and Order #6 and Judgment - Pro Se #7 on behalf of Petitioner Richard Nehls. (LKO)
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by the Clerk that the appeal filing fee has not been paid and that a ruling on the certificate of appealability has already been made and no further action is needed on this issue and has been sent to Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf as to Petitioner Richard Nehls (TCL)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEAL regarding Memorandum and Order #6 , Judgment #7 on behalf of Petitioner Richard Nehls. Copy of Notice of Appeal mailed to petitioner at SPR-NORFOLK, Norfolk Regional Center, P.O. Box 1209, Norfolk, NE 68702-1209. (TCL)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED that the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (and any amendments or supplements thereto) is denied and dismissed with prejudice. No certificate of appealability has been or will be issued. (Attachments: #1 Notice - Civil Appeals in Pro Se Cases) Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that: The petition (filing no. #1 ) is denied and dismissed with prejudice. The court will not issue a certificate of appealability in this matter. The court will enter a separate judgment in accordance with this order. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Filing No. #2 ) is granted. The next step in this case is for the court to conduct a preliminary review of the habeas corpus petition in accordance with Rule 4 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 cases. The court will conduct this review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel on behalf of Petitioner Richard Nehls. (LKO) Modified on 7/8/2019 to correct spelling of name (DKM).
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Petitioner Richard Nehls. (LKO) Modified on 7/8/2019 to correct spelling of name (DKM).
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed on behalf of pro se petitioner Richard Nehls. (LKO) Modified on 7/8/2019 to correct spelling of name (DKM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nehls v. State of Nebraska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Nebraska Attorney General
Represented By: Douglas J. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard Nehis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard Nehls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Nebraska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?