Onuachi v. Master Builders, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Uju Onuachi
Defendant: Master Builders Inc., Timmermier, Gross & Prentiss, Harry S. Peterson Company, Alliance Group Inc, Cassem, Adams, Gotch, & Douglas, Pickens, Green & Cleason L.L.P., Meylan Enterprises Inc., Western Waterproofing Co., Inc. and The Western Group
Case Number: 8:2019cv00291
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Uju Onuachi. (LKO)
August 29, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE OF APPEAL regarding Memorandum and Order #22 and Text Order 43 on behalf of Plaintiff Uju Onuachi. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 TEXT ORDER - The Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment, ECF No. #41 , is summarily denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
July 29, 2019 Filing 42 Memorandum in support of Motion to Amend under FRCP Rule 59(e) #41 on behalf of Plaintiff Uju Onuachi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(LKO)
July 29, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION to Alter or Amend Judgment - Pro Se #40 , UND FRCP Rule 59(e) on behalf of Plaintiff Uju Onuachi. (LKO)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 JUDGMENT - PRO SE - In accordance with the accompanying Memorandum and Order of this date, IT IS ORDERED: The Motions to Dismiss, ECF Nos. #33 & #35 , are granted. The Motion to Set Aside Judgment, ECF No. #34 , filed by Plaintiff Uju Onuachi, is denied. The above-captioned action is dismissed, with prejudice. (Attachments: #1 Notice - Civil Appeals in Pro Se Cases) Ordered by Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Motions to Dismiss, ECF Nos. #33 & #35 , are granted. The Motion to Set Aside Judgment, ECF No. #34 , filed by Plaintiff Uju Onuachi, is denied. The above-captioned action is dismissed, with prejudice. A separate judgment will be entered. Ordered by Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
July 17, 2019 Filing 38 Plaintiff's Response to Respondent the Alliance Group Inc. MOTION to Dismiss, Motion tor Sanctions and Reply to Alliance Group Inc.'s Resistance to Plaintiff's Motion to Set Aside the Void Order of July 1, 2019 Under Rule on behalf of Plaintiff Uju Onuachi.(DKM)
July 15, 2019 Filing 37 RESPONSE regarding Attorney Letter #27 by Attorney Monica A. Sansalone that she was granted permission to withdraw in USDC-Ohio on behalf of Defendant Cassem, Adams, Gotch, & Douglas. (ADB)
July 15, 2019 Filing 36 RESPONSE regarding MOTION to Dismiss and MOTION for Sanctions #33 on behalf of Plaintiff Uju Onuachi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (LKO)
July 11, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION to Dismiss Motion tor Sanctions and Resistance to Plaintiff's Motion to Set Aside Judgment by Attorney Jacqueline M. DeLuca on behalf of Defendant Alliance Group Inc.(DeLuca, Jacqueline)
July 11, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION to Set Aside a Judgment under Rule 60 on behalf of Plaintiff Uju Onuachi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(LKO)
July 10, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION to Dismiss and MOTION for Sanctions by Attorney Elizabeth R. Cano on behalf of Defendants Harry S. Peterson Company, Master Builders Inc., The Western Group, Western Waterproofing Co., Inc..(Cano, Elizabeth)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 TEXT ORDER - Pursuant to the Notice of Substitution of Counsel #28 Attorneys Faith C. Whittaker and Christopher M. Jones are terminated as counsel for Defendant Meylan Enterprises, Inc. and shall no longer receive notice in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 TEXT ORDER granting #29 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Emily S. Prem and Kimberly L. Beck are terminated as counsel for Defendant The Alliance Group Inc. and shall no longer receive notice in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
July 9, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Jacqueline M. DeLuca on behalf of Defendant Alliance Group Inc (DeLuca, Jacqueline)
July 9, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Attorney Jacqueline M. DeLuca on behalf of Defendant Alliance Group Inc.(DeLuca, Jacqueline)
July 9, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance Notice of Substitution of Counsel by Attorney Nicole K. Griffard on behalf of Defendant Meylan Enterprises Inc. (Griffard, Nicole)
July 2, 2019 Filing 27 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Monica A. Sansalone has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
July 2, 2019 Filing 26 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Emily Serger Prem has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
July 2, 2019 Filing 25 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Faith C. Whittaker has not registered for admittance to practice. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
July 2, 2019 Filing 24 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
July 1, 2019 Case transferred to District of Nebraska.Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (eh) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/1/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER ADOPTING #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 7/1/2019. It is ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction and/or for failure to state any claim. It is further ORDERED that plaintiff is forewarned that the complaint in this case appears to be closely related to prior frivolous cases filed in the District of Nebraska as to violate Rule 11, Fed R. Civ. P. and that any future filing in this United States District Court concerning the same subjection mater will be DISMISSED. In the alternative, theCourt TRANSFERS this case to the District of Nebraska for further proceedings, including sanctions if appropriate. (eh)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/1/2019.]
June 28, 2019 Filing 21 Reply re #18 Objection to Report and Recommendations by Defendant Alliance Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Prem, Emily) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/1/2019.]
June 26, 2019 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to Harry S. Peterson Company, Master Builders, Inc., Pickens, Green & Cleason L.L.P., The Western Group, Timmermier, Gross & Prentiss. (sct) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/1/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant The Western Group. The Western Group served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. (sct) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/1/2019.]
June 19, 2019 Filing 18 OBJECTION to #6 Report and Recommendations by Plaintiff Uju Onuachi. (sct) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/1/2019.]
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Notation ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time until 6/19/19 to file objections to the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 6/7/19. (wam)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/1/2019.]
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #17 Defendant Cassem, Adams, Gotch, & Douglas' Motion to Stay or Extend Time to Answer to the extent that the deadline for Defendant to answer, move or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's Complaint is hereby STAYED pending this Court's final disposition on the 5/22/2019 Report and Recommendation of the undersigned #6 . In the event that the Report and Recommendation is not adopted by the presiding district judge, Defendant shall have 14 days from the date of the Order to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 6/6/2019. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/1/2019.]
June 6, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Stay Proceedings or, in the Alternative, Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Cassem, Adams, Gotch, & Douglas. (Sansalone, Monica) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/1/2019.]
June 5, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responses in Opposition to the District Court's Report and Recommendation by Plaintiff Uju Onuachi. (jlw) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/1/2019.]
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Defendant Meylan Enterprises, Inc.'s Motion to Stay Proceedings to the extent that the deadline for Defendant to answer, move or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's Complaint is hereby STAYED pending this Court's final disposition on the 5/22/2019 Report and Recommendation of the undersigned #6 . In the event that the Report and Recommendation is not adopted by the presiding district judge, Meylan shall have 14 days from the date of the Order to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 6/5/2019. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/1/2019.]
June 4, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Stay by Defendant Meylan Enterprises Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Whittaker, Faith) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/1/2019.]
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Defendant Alliance Group Inc.'s Motion to Stay to the extent that the deadline for Defendant to answer, move or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's Complaint is hereby STAYED pending this Court's final disposition on the 5/22/2019 Report and Recommendation of the undersigned #6 . In the event that the Report and Recommendation is not adopted by the presiding district judge, Alliance shall have 14 days from the date of the Order to answer, move or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's Complaint in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 5/30/2019. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) Modified Docket Text on 5/31/2019 (km). [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/1/2019.]
May 29, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay by Defendant Alliance Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Stay) (Prem, Emily) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/1/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE: Green card returned signed without a date. USPS does not show that the package was delivered. (jlw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/1/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants Alliance Group Inc, Cassem, Adams, Gotch, & Douglas. Alliance Group Inc served on 5/15/2019, answer due 6/5/2019; Cassem, Adams, Gotch, & Douglas served on 5/16/2019, answer due 6/6/2019. (jlw) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/1/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Master Builders, Inc.. (jlw) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/1/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Harry S. Peterson Company. (jlw) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/1/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Western Waterproofing Co., Inc.. (jlw) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/1/2019.]
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Uju Onuachi. IT IS RECOMMENDED THAT this case be DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction and/or for failure to state any claim. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED THAT Plaintiff be forewarned that the instant complaint appears to be so closely related to prior frivolous cases filed in the District of Nebraska as to violate Rule 11, Fed. R. Civ. P., and that any future filings in this U.S. District Court concerning the same subject matter therefore will be summarily dismissed. In the alternative, the undersigned recommends transfer to the District of Nebraska for further proceedings, including sanctions if appropriate. Objections to R&R due by 6/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 5/22/2019. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/1/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Pickens, Green & Cleason L.L.P.. (jlw) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/1/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Timmermier, Gross & Prentiss. (jlw) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/1/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Mailing: Certified mailing of summons and complaint through the Clerk's Office pursuant to Local Rule 4.2. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (bjc) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/1/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Alliance Group Inc, Cassem, Adams, Gotch, & Douglas, Harry S. Peterson Company, Master Builders, Inc., Meylan Enterprises Inc., Pickens, Green & Cleason L.L.P., The Western Group, Timmermier, Gross & Prentiss, Western Waterproofing Co., Inc.. (jlw) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/1/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 100cin036749 (jlw) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/1/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants, filed by Uju Onuachi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt) (jlw) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/1/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Onuachi v. Master Builders, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Master Builders Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth R. Cano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timmermier, Gross & Prentiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry S. Peterson Company
Represented By: Elizabeth R. Cano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliance Group Inc
Represented By: Emily Serger Prem
Represented By: Jacqueline M. DeLuca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cassem, Adams, Gotch, & Douglas
Represented By: Monica A. Sansalone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pickens, Green & Cleason L.L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meylan Enterprises Inc.
Represented By: Faith C. Whittaker
Represented By: Nicole K. Griffard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Waterproofing Co., Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth R. Cano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Western Group
Represented By: Elizabeth R. Cano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uju Onuachi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?