Richard Schicker v. Lincoln Financial Group
Plaintiff: Richard Schicker
Defendant: Lincoln Financial Group
Case Number: 8:2019cv00295
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Michael D Nelson
Referring Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1451
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #6 by Attorney Steven D. Davidson on behalf of Defendant Lincoln Financial Group.(Davidson, Steven)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Reply Brief. Defendant shall have an extension to August 10, 2019, to file a reply brief in support of its Motion to Dismiss #6 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Extend Time to Submit Reply Brief by Attorney Steven D. Davidson on behalf of Defendant Lincoln Financial Group.(Davidson, Steven)
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #6 by Attorney Richard J. Schicker on behalf of Plaintiff Richard Schicker. (LKO)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #6 by Attorney Steven D. Davidson on behalf of Defendant Lincoln Financial Group.(Davidson, Steven)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Attorney Steven D. Davidson on behalf of Defendant Lincoln Financial Group.(Davidson, Steven)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant shall have an extension of time to July 24, 2019, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Steven D. Davidson on behalf of Defendant Lincoln Financial Group.(Davidson, Steven)
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Richard J. Schicker has not paid the biennial assessment. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Richard Schicker from District Court of Douglas County, Nebraska, Case number 19-3752 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3971909) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Steven D. Davidson on behalf of Lincoln Financial Group (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Insurance, #2 Exhibit 2 - Pleadings, #3 Exhibit 3 - State Court Removal)(Davidson, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richard Schicker v. Lincoln Financial Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Financial Group
Represented By: Steven D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Schicker
Represented By: Richard J. Schicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?