Robinson v. Fair et al
Plaintiff: Kirk Robinson
Defendant: Jeff Stevens and Randy Fair
Case Number: 8:2019cv00299
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Referring Judge: Richard G Kopf
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 23 LETTER on behalf of Plaintiff Kirk Robinson. (KLF)
August 15, 2019 TEXT ENTRY THAT INITIAL PARTIAL FILING fee paid on behalf of Kirk Robinson on 8/15/2019. Receipt number 8052962, in the amount of $6.00. (KLF)
August 13, 2019 Filing 22 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to Kirk Robinson, #6547, SPR-LINC DIAGNOSTIC, Lincoln Diagnostic & Evaluation Center, P.O. Box 22800, Lincoln, NE 68542-2800 regarding Order #18 . Mail resent to Kirk Robinson, Buffalo County Jail, P.O. Box 2228, Kearney, NE 68848 per Motion #20 . (KLF)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the Plaintiff's motion for dismissal (Filing #20 ), filed prior to service of an answer or motion for summary judgment by the Defendants, and pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i), this case is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff is hereby notified that the filing of a notice of appeal will make him liable for payment of the full $505.00 appellate filing fee regardless of the outcome of the appeal. This is because the Prison Litigation Reform Act requires an incarcerated civil appellant to pay the full amount of the $505.00 appellate filing fee by making monthly payments to the court, even if he or she is proceeding in forma pauperis. 28 U.S.C. 1915(b). By filing a notice of appeal, Plaintiff will be consenting to the deduction of the $505.00 filing fee from his prison account by prison officials. (Attachments: #1 Notice - Civil Appeals in Pro Se Cases) Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
August 12, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss on behalf of Plaintiff Kirk Robinson. (KLF)
August 6, 2019 Filing 19 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to Kirk Robinson regarding Memorandum and Order #10 . Mail was resent to SPR-LINC DIAGNOSTIC, Lincoln Diagnostic & Evaluation Center, P.O. Box 22800, Lincoln, NE 68542-2800. (LAC)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion to Amend (Filing No. #17 ) is premature and is denied without prejudice to reassertion should Plaintiff's case be permitted to proceed after Plaintiff pays his initial partial filing fee and after the court conducts initial review of Plaintiff's Complaint. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
August 2, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Amend List of Defendants and Amend Claim for Damages on behalf of Plaintiff Kirk Robinson. (KLF)
July 31, 2019 Filing 16 LETTER on behalf of Plaintiff Kirk Robinson. (LKO)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Clerk of Court shall mail a copy of Filing No. #10 to Plaintiff at the Lincoln Diagnostic & Evaluation Center, which is Plaintiff's current address of record. Plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $5.32 on or before August 22, 2019, as directed in Filing No. #10 . Plaintiff's Motions to Amend the Complaint (Filing Nos. #7 , #8 , #11 ) are premature and are denied without prejudice to reassertion should Plaintiff's case be permitted to proceed after initial review of Plaintiff's Complaint. Plaintiff is advised to stop filing Motions to Amend the Complaint and letters requesting the same until the court has conducted initial review of the Complaint and has ruled that this case may progress. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
July 29, 2019 Filing 14 LETTER on behalf of Plaintiff Kirk Robinson.(LKO)
July 29, 2019 Filing 13 LETTER on behalf of Plaintiff Kirk Robinson. (LKO)
July 26, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of Address on behalf of Plaintiff Kirk Robinson. (LKO)
July 25, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Amend List of Defendants on behalf of Plaintiff Kirk Robinson. (KLF)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP (Filing No. #2 ) is granted. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $5.32 within 30 days, unless the court extends the time in which he has to pay in response to a written motion. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff's institution must collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and forward those payments to the court. The clerk's office is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: August 22, 2019: initial partial filing fee payment due. Plaintiff is advised that, following payment of the initial partial filing fee, the next step in Plaintiff's case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of Plaintiff's claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party and Plaintiff's institution; e-mailed to Finance) (KLF)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 PRISONER ACCOUNT CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Kirk Robinson. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (KLF)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Amend on behalf of Plaintiff Kirk Robinson. (KLF)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend Claim for Damages on behalf of Plaintiff Kirk Robinson. (LKO)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER by Clerk requesting plaintiff's trust account statement from institution. Letter sent to Buffalo County Jail, c/o Accounting, P.O. Box 2228, Kearney, NE 68848. (KLF)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 GENERAL ORDER NO. 2016-02: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Plaintiff Kirk Robinson. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (KLF)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Kirk Robinson. (KLF)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Keith County Attorney Randy Fair and Keith County Sheriff Jeff Stevens filed on behalf of pro se plaintiff Kirk Robinson. (KLF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Fair et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Fair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirk Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?