etrailer Corporation v. Automatic Equipment Mfg, Co.

Plaintiff: etrailer Corporation
Defendant: Automatic Equipment Mfg, Co.
Case Number: 8:2019cv00300
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Brian C Buescher
Referring Judge: John M Gerrard
2 Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT REASSIGNMENT ORDER that in the interest of judicial economy, this case is reassigned to District Judge Brian C. Buescher, for disposition. The magistrate judge remains assigned to the case for judicial supervision and processing of all pretrial matters. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. Member Cases: 8:18-cv-00351-JMG-MDN, 8:19-cv-00300-JMG-MDN (JLS)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Member Cases: 8:18-cv-00351-JMG-MDN, 8:19-cv-00300-JMG-MDN Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - Plaintiff Etrailer Corporation's Motion to Consolidate (Filing No. 36 in Case No. 8:18CV351) is granted. The above-captioned cases are consolidated for all purposes. The Court designates Case No. 8:18CV351 as the "Lead Case" and Case No. 8:19CV300 as the "Member Case." The Court's CM/ECF System has the capacity for "spreading" text among the consolidated cases. If properly docketed, the documents filed in the Lead Case will automatically be filed in the Member Case. The parties are instructed to file documents in the Lead Case and to select the option "yes" in response to the System's question whether to spread the text. The parties may not use the spread text feature to file complaints, amended complaints, and answers; to pay filing fees electronically using pay.gov; or to file items related to service of process. If a party believes an item in addition to those described in paragraph 3 should not be filed in all the consolidated cases, the party must move for permission to file the item in the Member Case. The motion must be filed in both the consolidated cases using the spread text feature. On or before September 13, 2019, the parties shall jointly file a Rule 26(f) Report that encompasses both cases. See Filing No. 32 in Case No. 8:18CV351. Member Cases: 8:18-cv-00351-JMG-MDN, 8:19-cv-00300-JMG-MDN Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
August 26, 2019 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Hesse Enterprises, Inc., Corporate Parent Hesse Enterprises, Inc. for Automatic Equipment Mfg, Co., Automatic Equipment Mfg, Co.. by Attorney Brian T. McKernan on behalf of Counter Claimants Automatic Equipment Mfg, Co., Hesse Enterprises, Inc., Hesse Enterprises, Inc., Defendants Automatic Equipment Mfg, Co., Hesse Enterprises, Inc., Hesse Enterprises, Inc..(McKernan, Brian)
August 23, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to Counterclaim by etrailer Corporation (Kelly, Don)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Nicole K. Griffard is granted leave to withdraw as counsel for Automatic Equipment Mfg. Co., d/b/a Blue Ox and shall no longer receive electronic notice in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
August 22, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Attorney Nicole K. Griffard on behalf of Counter Claimant Automatic Equipment Mfg, Co., Defendant Automatic Equipment Mfg, Co..(Griffard, Nicole)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion to Withdraw Document. The plaintiff's request for summons as to the defendant at filing #7 is deemed withdrawn. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
August 16, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #9 for attorney Don Kelly. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-3998024 by Attorney Don V. Kelly on behalf of Plaintiff etrailer Corporation.(Kelly, Don)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Withdraw Document regarding Summons Requested #7 by Attorney Christopher J. Tjaden on behalf of Plaintiff etrailer Corporation, Counter Defendant etrailer Corporation.(Tjaden, Christopher)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Requested as to Defendant regarding Complaint #1 . (Tjaden, Christopher)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Automatic Equipment Mfg, Co. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (KMM)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM with Jury Demand against etrailer Corporation regarding Complaint #1 filed by etrailer Corporation by Automatic Equipment Mfg, Co. (McKernan, Brian)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Copyright Infringement (original form mailed to the Office of Register of Copyrights with a copy of complaint.) (LAC)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LAC)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Christopher J. Tjaden on behalf of Plaintiff etrailer Corporation.(Tjaden, Christopher)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Automatic Equipment Mfg, Co. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3972732), by Attorney Christopher J. Tjaden on behalf of etrailer Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tjaden, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: etrailer Corporation v. Automatic Equipment Mfg, Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Automatic Equipment Mfg, Co.
Represented By: Nicole K. Griffard
Represented By: Brian T. McKernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: etrailer Corporation
Represented By: Christopher J. Tjaden
Represented By: Don V. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?