United States of America v. $37,200.00 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $37,200.00 in United States Currency
Case Number: 8:2019cv00302
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT - The Motion for Default Judgment is hereby granted with regard to Christopher Emerson. All right, title and interest in or to $37,200.00 U.S. currency of the defendant property held by Christopher Emerson is hereby forever barred and foreclosed. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to defaulted defendant) (KMM)
August 27, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Amend MOTION for Default Judgment against $37,200.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY #11 by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Blackburn, Amy)
August 27, 2019 Filing 14 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon, Motion Hearing held on 8/27/2019 regarding MOTION for Default Judgment against $37,200.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY #11 . Mr. Emerson, who filed a claim in the administrative forfeiture but who has not filed a claim in this action, was not present. Motion will be granted; USA to submit revised proposed order. Hearing held in Omaha. Courtroom Deputy: Amy Brunswick; Reporter: Lisa Grimminger ; Appearance for Plaintiff: Amy Blackburn: Appearance for Defendant: None. Time Start: 10:58 AM; Time Stop: 11:06 AM; Time in Court: 8 Minutes. (ADB)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion regarding MOTION for Default Judgment against $37,200.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY #11 . A Motion Hearing is set for 8/27/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon.Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to defaulted defendant)(TCL)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REASSIGNMENT ORDER - that this case is reassigned to Senior District Judge Joseph F. Bataillon for disposition and remains assigned to Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart for judicial supervision. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (KLF)
August 21, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Default Judgment against $37,200.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Blackburn, Amy)
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against Defendant $37,200.00 in United States Currency (Christopher Emerson). Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (Copy mailed to defendant) (KLF)
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 INDEX in support of MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default against $37,200.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY #8 by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Blackburn, Amy)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default against $37,200.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Blackburn, Amy)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Service by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Blackburn, Amy)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR PUBLICATION - This matter is before the Court on the Motion for Publication (Filing No. #5 ), filed by the United States of America. The Motion is granted and the United States is directed to publish such notification as requested. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (KLF)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION FOR PUBLICATION by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Blackburn, Amy)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 WARRANT IN REM Issued. (LKO)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America (Blackburn, Amy)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against $37,200.00 in United States Currency, by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Blackburn, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $37,200.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $37,200.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Amy B. Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?