United States of America v. $41,940.00 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $41,940.00 in United States Currency
Claimant: Asgeir Asgeirsson
Case Number: 8:2019cv00304
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 15 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION File Claim out of Time #14 by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Blackburn, Amy)
August 29, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION File Claim out of Time by Attorney Jason E. Troia on behalf of Claimant Asgeir Asgeirsson. (Attachments: #1 Seized Asset Claim Form)(Troia, Jason)
August 27, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Blackburn, Amy)
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Strike Answer to Complaint #7 by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Blackburn, Amy)
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Service by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Blackburn, Amy)
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Service by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America (Blackburn, Amy)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (TCL)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 8/30/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (TCL)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint for Forfeiture by $41,940.00 in United States Currency (Troia, Jason)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for publication. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (ADB)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION FOR PUBLICATION by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Blackburn, Amy)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 WARRANT IN REM (COPY) Issued. (JAB)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America (Blackburn, Amy)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against $41,940.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY, by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Blackburn, Amy) Modified on 7/11/2019 to reflect correct party name (LKO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $41,940.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $41,940.00 in United States Currency
Represented By: Jason E. Troia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Amy B. Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Asgeir Asgeirsson
Represented By: Jason E. Troia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?