United States of America v. Gilmore et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Complete Call Solutions, LLC and Jenny Gilmore
Case Number: 8:2019cv00309
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: John M Gerrard
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Unopposed Motion to Continue Show Cause Hearing Deadline. The hearing to show cause scheduled for September 9, 2019 is continued to October 9, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 7, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (MBM) Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (MBM)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Continue Show Cause Hearing Deadline by Attorney Jaclyn L. Klintoe on behalf of Defendants Complete Call Solutions, LLC, Jenny Gilmore.(Klintoe, Jaclyn)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate regarding Declaration #4 by Attorney Laurie A. Kelly on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Kelly, Laurie)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 DECLARATION regarding Order Setting Hearing or Trial, #3 , Complaint #1 Declaration of Danielle Platt Regarding Service by Attorney Laurie A. Kelly on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Kelly, Laurie)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Jenny Gilmore, as Member of Complete Call Solutions LLC, shall appear before the District Court of the United States for the District of Nebraska, at 111 S. 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska at 10:00 a.m. on the 9th day of September, 2019, in Courtroom 7, to show cause why she should not be compelled to comply with the Internal Revenue Service summons served on respondent on December 18, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (KLF)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (ADB)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Complete Call Solutions, LLC, Jenny Gilmore, by Attorney Laurie A. Kelly on behalf of United States of America (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Danielle Platt, #2 IRS Summons)(Kelly, Laurie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Gilmore et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Complete Call Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Jaclyn L. Klintoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenny Gilmore
Represented By: Jaclyn L. Klintoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Laurie A. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?