Johnson et al v. Friesen
Plaintiff: J.T. Johnson and J.T. Johnson, Jr.
Defendant: Jenna R. Friesen
Case Number: 8:2019cv00322
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Brian C Buescher
2 Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY BRIEF in opposition to DEFENDANT MOTION FRCP 12 by Attorney Larry R. Demerath on behalf of Plaintiff J.T. Johnson, Jr..(Demerath, Larry)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT REASSIGNMENT ORDER - that in the interest of judicial economy, this case is reassigned to Judge Brian C. Buescher for disposition. The magistrate judge remains assigned to the case for judicial supervision and processing of all pretrial matters. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (DKM)
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY BRIEF in support of MOTION to Dismiss Second Cause of Action and Make First Cause of Action More Definite #7 by Attorney Michael T. Gibbons on behalf of Defendant Jenna R. Friesen.(Gibbons, Michael)
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY BRIEF in opposition to FRCP RULE 12 by Attorney Larry R. Demerath on behalf of Plaintiff J.T. Johnson, Jr..(Demerath, Larry)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Dismiss Second Cause of Action and Make First Cause of Action More Definite #7 by Attorney Michael T. Gibbons on behalf of Defendant Jenna R. Friesen.(Gibbons, Michael)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Second Cause of Action and Make First Cause of Action More Definite by Attorney Michael T. Gibbons on behalf of Defendant Jenna R. Friesen.(Gibbons, Michael)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon DEFENDANT FRIESEN defendant All Defendants. (Demerath, Larry)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to defendant Jenna R. Friesen. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint, #1 . (Demerath, Larry)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Larry R. Demerath has not paid the biennial assessment. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Jenna R. Friesen ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3983614), by Attorney Larry R. Demerath on behalf of J.T. Johnson (Attachments: #1 Submission From Sender)(Demerath, Larry) Modified on 7/24/2019 to reflect correct parties per the complaint (LKO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. Friesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.T. Johnson
Represented By: Larry R. Demerath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.T. Johnson, Jr.
Represented By: Larry R. Demerath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenna R. Friesen
Represented By: Michael T. Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?