Nelson v. Kunkle et al
Plaintiff: Barbara Nelson
Defendant: Julie Kunkle and American Blue Ribbon Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv00329
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Brian C Buescher
2 Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Mediation. This matter is stayed until November 11, 2019. The parties shall file a report advising the Court as to the status of this case by November 11, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
September 10, 2019 Filing 10 JOINT MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Mediation by Attorney Danielle L. Kitson on behalf of Defendant American Blue Ribbon Holdings, LLC.(Kitson, Danielle)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT REASSIGNMENT ORDER - that in the interest of judicial economy, this case is reassigned to Judge Brian C. Buescher for disposition. The magistrate judge remains assigned to the case for judicial supervision and processing of all pretrial matters. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (DKM)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. American Blue Ribbon Holdings, LLC shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by September 10, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint by Attorney Danielle L. Kitson on behalf of Defendant American Blue Ribbon Holdings, LLC.(Kitson, Danielle)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of service of Summons Returned Executed on 07/31/19 upon Julie Kunkle by Attorney Patrick M. Flood on behalf of Plaintiff Barbara Nelson.(Flood, Patrick)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN of service of Summons Returned Executed on 07/31/19 upon American Blue Ribbon Holdings, LLC by Attorney Patrick M. Flood on behalf of Plaintiff Barbara Nelson.(Flood, Patrick)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to defendants American Blue Ribbon Holdings, LLC and Julie Kunkle. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to Julie Kunkle and American Blue Ribbon Holdings, LLC regarding Complaint #1 . (Flood, Patrick)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against American Blue Ribbon Holdings, LLC, Julie Kunkle ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3986830), by Attorney Patrick M. Flood on behalf of Barbara Nelson(Flood, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Kunkle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Nelson
Represented By: Patrick M. Flood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Blue Ribbon Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Danielle L. Kitson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?