Knight-Bey v. Bacon et al
Plaintiff: Dr. Phyllis Marie Knight-Bey
Defendant: Nebraska Department of Health and Human Services, Office of Inspector General, Don Bacon and Social Security Administration
Case Number: 8:2019cv00330
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Referring Judge: Richard G Kopf
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Plaintiff is advised that the next step in her case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of her claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(SLP)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Phyllis Marie Knight-Bey. (LAC)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Plaintiff is directed to submit the $400.00 fees to the clerk's office or submit a request to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days. Failure to take either action will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. The clerk of the court is directed to send to Plaintiff the Form AO240 ("Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit"). The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: September 4, 2019: Check for MIFP or payment. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT filed by Plaintiff Phyllis Marie Knight-Bey. (Scanned document has been compared to the paper document and it has been determined that the scanned document is as legible as the paper document) (MBM)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 GENERAL ORDER NO. 2016-02: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (SLP)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (SLP)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed on behalf of Phyllis Marie Knight-Bey. (SLP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knight-Bey v. Bacon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nebraska Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Inspector General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Phyllis Marie Knight-Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?