SWJKM, LLC v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: SWJKM, LLC
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 8:2019cv00334
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Brian C Buescher
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 26 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #25 for attorney Sean M. Patterson. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
September 17, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4019803 by Attorney Sean M. Patterson on behalf of Plaintiff SWJKM, LLC.(Patterson, Sean)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - Depositions due July 2, 2020. Pretrial Conference set for 11/2/2020 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. Telephone Conference to discuss the status of case progression and the parties' interest in settlement is set for 7/20/2020 at 11:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (ADB)
September 9, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Service of Defendant Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Attorney Matthew D. Hammes on behalf of Defendant Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company (Hammes, Matthew)
September 9, 2019 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney John Z. Moseley on behalf of Plaintiff SWJKM, LLC.(Moseley, John)
September 9, 2019 Filing 21 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney John Z. Moseley on behalf of Plaintiff SWJKM, LLC.(Moseley, John)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT REASSIGNMENT ORDER - that in the interest of judicial economy, this case is reassigned to Judge Brian C. Buescher for disposition. The magistrate judge remains assigned to the case for judicial supervision and processing of all pretrial matters. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (DKM)
August 15, 2019 Filing 19 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #16 for attorney James McClenny. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting #17 Motion to Extend. Plaintiff SWJKM, LLC d/b/a Total Logistics Solutions shall have an extension of time to September 9, 2019, to file its Corporate Disclosure Statement. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
August 14, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Extend Time to File Corporate Disclosures by Attorney Derek L. Fadner on behalf of Plaintiff SWJKM, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Fadner, Derek)
August 14, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-3997063 by Attorney James M. McClenny on behalf of Plaintiff SWJKM, LLC.(McClenny, James)
August 13, 2019 Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #13 for attorney John Moseley. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
August 13, 2019 Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #12 for attorney Derek Fadner. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
August 13, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number BNEDC-3996363 by Attorney John Z. Moseley on behalf of Plaintiff SWJKM, LLC.(Moseley, John)
August 13, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-3996331 by Attorney Derek L. Fadner on behalf of Plaintiff SWJKM, LLC.(Fadner, Derek)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (TCL)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 9/9/2019.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (TCL)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Matthew D. Hammes on behalf of Defendant Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company.(Hammes, Matthew)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 with Jury Demand and Request for Place of Trial in Omaha, NE by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company (Hammes, Matthew)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney James M. McClenny has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (KLF)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney J. Zachary Moseley has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (KLF)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Derek L. Fadner has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (KLF)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(KLF)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff SWJKM, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(KLF)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (KLF)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against SWJKM, LLC from District Court of Douglas County, Nebraska, Case number D01CI190005167 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3988043) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Matthew D. Hammes on behalf of Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Mail Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B - Service of Process and Complaint)(Hammes, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SWJKM, LLC v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SWJKM, LLC
Represented By: Ryan M. Sewell
Represented By: John Z. Moseley
Represented By: James M. McClenny
Represented By: Sean M. Patterson
Represented By: Derek L. Fadner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew D. Hammes
Represented By: Cristina Fackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?