Demps v. JVB Consulting, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Michael Demps
Defendant: Express Distribution LLC, JVB Consulting, Inc and JVB Consulting, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv00344
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: John M Gerrard
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (ADB)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 10/24/2019.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (ADB)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by Express Distribution LLC, JVB Consulting, Inc. (Stull, Jeanette)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendants are granted until September 23, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to the allegations in Plaintiff's Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading () by Attorney Jeanette L. Stull on behalf of Defendants Express Distribution LLC, JVB Consulting, Inc..(Stull, Jeanette) Modified on 8/22/2019 to remove incorrectly added event (DCD)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Jeanette L. Stull on behalf of Defendant JVB Consulting, Inc.(Stull, Jeanette)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Jeanette L. Stull on behalf of Defendant Express Distribution LLC.(Stull, Jeanette)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Express Distribution LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant JVB Consulting, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against All Plaintiffs from District Court of Douglas County, Case number 19 - 5621 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3992972) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Jeanette L. Stull on behalf of JVB Consulting, Inc, Express Distribution LLC(Stull, Jeanette)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Demps v. JVB Consulting, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Demps
Represented By: Abby K. Osborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Distribution LLC
Represented By: Jeanette L. Stull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JVB Consulting, Inc
Represented By: Jeanette L. Stull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JVB Consulting, Inc.
Represented By: Jeanette L. Stull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?