Nooner v. State of Nebraska et. al.
Plaintiff: Terrick Nooner and Mr. Terrick Nooner
Defendant: State of Nebraska et. al., Quinn Robert Eaton, Ms. Marnie Jensen and State of Nebraska
Case Number: 8:2019cv00360
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
2 Judge: Richard G Kopf
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the court's Memorandum and Order granting Plaintiff leave to proceed IFP (filing no. 9) is set aside and vacated. Plaintiff has 30 days to either show cause for why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g) or pay the court's $400.00 filing and administrative fees. Plaintiff's pending motions (filing nos. 10, 11, & 12) are denied. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: October 16, 2019: deadline for Plaintiff to show cause or pay fees. Ordered by Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (ADB)
September 6, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on behalf of Plaintiff Terrick Nooner. (LAC)
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Production of Documents on behalf of Plaintiff Terrick Nooner. (LAC)
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION on behalf of Plaintiff Terrick Nooner.(LAC)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SET ASIDE AND VACATED - MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff Terrick Nooner shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $5.20 within 30 days, unless an enlargement of time is granted in response to a written motion. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: September 30, 2019: initial partial filing fee payment due. Plaintiff is advised that, following payment of the initial partial filing fee, the next step in Plaintiff's case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of Plaintiff's claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Plaintiff's Motion for summons #4 is denied as premature. Ordered by Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party and institution as directed)(ADB) Modified on 9/16/2019 to set aside and vacate per order #13 (ADB).
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REASSIGNMENT ORDER that this case is reassigned to Senior District Judge Laurie Smith Camp for disposition and remains assigned to the pro se docket for judicial supervision. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that the clerk's office shall randomly assign a new judge to this case and request a reassignment order from the Chief Judge. The chief pro se staff attorney will assist the judge to whom the case is reassigned if requested to do so. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 GENERAL ORDER NO. 2016-02: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (SLP)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (SLP)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Summons on behalf of Plaintiff Terrick Nooner. (SLP)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Plaintiff Terrick Nooner. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (SLP)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Terrick Nooner. (SLP)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against State of Nebraska, Quinn Robert Eaton, and Ms. Marnie Jensen. filed on behalf of Terrick Nooner. (SLP) Modified on 8/26/2019 (LKO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nooner v. State of Nebraska et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nebraska et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quinn Robert Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Marnie Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nebraska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrick Nooner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Terrick Nooner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?