Holte v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Ronald K. Holte
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 8:2019cv00389
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: The parties are considering proposed new progression timelines for many of the toxic exposure cases against Union Pacific Railroad. Until the new proposed progression timelines come in and the court can review them, the court is not prepared to put out a final progression order in cases with newly-filed answers. In the interim, IT IS ORDERED: The deadline for serving initial mandatory disclosures under Rule 26(a)(1) for each of the above-captioned cases is December 12, 2019. In each of the above-captioned cases, the clerk shall enter an internal case management deadline of December 30, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (ADB)
October 30, 2019 Filing 12 DEMAND for Trial by Jury Union Pacific by Attorney Daniel Hassing on behalf of Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company.(Hassing, Daniel)
October 30, 2019 Filing 11 Union Pacific ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by Union Pacific Railroad Company (Hassing, Daniel)
October 25, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Union Pacific Corporation for Union Pacific Railroad Company. by Attorney Daniel Hassing on behalf of Defendants Union Pacific Railroad Company, Union Pacific Corporation.(Hassing, Daniel)
October 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Daniel Hassing on behalf of Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company (Hassing, Daniel)
October 25, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(ADB)
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Anne M. O'Brien on behalf of Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company (O'Brien, Anne)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company on 9/23/2019. (Sassaman, Shawn)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued (COPY) as to defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company regarding Complaint #1 . YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (MLF)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint #1 . (Sassaman, Shawn)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REASSIGNMENT ORDER - that this case is reassigned to Senior District Judge Joseph F. Bataillon for disposition and to Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart for judicial supervision. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (KLF)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (KLF)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Union Pacific Railroad Company ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4013229), by Attorney Shawn M. Sassaman on behalf of Ronald Holte (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sassaman, Shawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holte v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald K. Holte
Represented By: Shawn M. Sassaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?