In Re: Specialty Retail Shops Holding Corp. et al
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Not Yet Classified: Official Unsecured Creditors' Committee and McKesson Corporation
Debtor: Specialty Retail Shops Holding Corp.
Interested Party: U.S. Bankruptcy Court
Case Number: 8:2019cv00405
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 23 SUPPLEMENT Record on Appeal regarding Bankruptcy Record on Appeal #1 . (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Appellant Designation) (KLF)
October 30, 2019 Filing 22 INDEX in support of Brief #21 (Appellant McKesson Corporation's Appendix of Excerpts of Records) by Attorney Michael J. Whaley on behalf of Creditor McKesson Corporation.(Whaley, Michael)
October 30, 2019 Filing 21 BRIEF in support of Notice of Filing Bankruptcy #1 Appeal by Attorney Michael J. Whaley on behalf of Creditor McKesson Corporation.(Whaley, Michael)
October 18, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave (to File Response to Appellees' Supplemental Material in Support of Motion to Determine Validity of Election, or in the Alternative, to Transfer the Appeal to the Bankruptcy Appellate Panel) by Attorney Michael J. Whaley on behalf of Creditor McKesson Corporation.(Whaley, Michael)
October 17, 2019 Filing 19 SUPPLEMENT regarding MOTION to Determine Validity of Election, or In the Alternative, to Transfer the Appeal to the Bankruptcy Appellate Panel #8 by Attorney George W. Hicks, Jr. on behalf of Debtor Specialty Retail Shops Holding Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hicks, George)
October 10, 2019 Filing 18 AMENDED Transmittal Letter - This is an amended transmittal. The one filed and sent earlier contained an Appellant Designation #1995 (ECF filing #16 ) in error.(JAB)
October 10, 2019 Filing 17 APPELLEES DESIGNATION OF ADDITIONAL RECORD ITEMS ON APPEAL regarding Bankruptcy Record on Appeal #1 . (KLF)
October 10, 2019 Filing 16 APPELLANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL DESIGNATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL regarding Bankruptcy Record on Appeal #1 (Attachments: #1 Supplement) (KLF)
October 6, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY regarding OBJECTION to Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #8 (Opposition to Motion to Determine Validity of Election, or in the Alternative, to Transfer the Appeal to the Bankruptcy Appellate Panel) #14 by Attorney George W. Hicks, Jr. on behalf of Debtor Specialty Retail Shops Holding Corp..(Hicks, George)
October 4, 2019 Filing 14 OBJECTION to Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #8 (Opposition to Motion to Determine Validity of Election, or in the Alternative, to Transfer the Appeal to the Bankruptcy Appellate Panel) by Attorney Michael J. Whaley on behalf of Creditor McKesson Corporation.(Whaley, Michael)
October 3, 2019 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #11 for attorney Jeffrey Garfinkle. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
October 3, 2019 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #10 for attorney Paul Arrow. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
October 2, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4030487 by Attorney Jeffrey K. Garfinkle on behalf of Creditor McKesson Corporation.(Garfinkle, Jeffrey)
October 2, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4030436 by Attorney Paul S. Arrow on behalf of Creditor McKesson Corporation.(Arrow, Paul)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - The appellants must serve and file a brief within 30 days after the date of this Order. The appellees must serve and file a brief within 30 days after service of the appellants' brief. Unless otherwise ordered, the briefs must meet the requirements of Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure. Ordered by Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (LKO)
October 1, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Determine Validity of Election, or In the Alternative, to Transfer the Appeal to the Bankruptcy Appellate Panel by Attorney George W. Hicks, Jr. on behalf of Debtor Specialty Retail Shops Holding Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Hicks, George)
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #6 for attorney George Hicks, Jr. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4027422 by Attorney George W. Hicks, Jr. on behalf of Debtor Specialty Retail Shops Holding Corp..(Hicks, George)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 BANKRUPTCY Record on appeal Bankruptcy Court case number 19-80064. (LKO)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF ISSUES TO BE PRESENTED by Attorney Michael J. Whaley on behalf of Creditor McKesson Corporation. (LKO)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT Record on Appeal regarding Bankruptcy Record on Appeal #1 . (LKO)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 TRANSMISSION OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL RECORD with bankruptcy docket sheet from USBC-Nebraska, Case Number BK19-80064. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet) (KLF)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Filing Bankruptcy Appeal. (Attachments: #1 e-mail to Clerk) (KLF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Specialty Retail Shops Holding Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: Jerry L. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Official Unsecured Creditors' Committee
Represented By: Alan J. Kornfeld
Represented By: Robert J. Feinstein
Represented By: Joel M. Carney
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Pomerantz
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Lally
Represented By: Bradford J. Sandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Richard P. Garden, Jr.
Represented By: Michael J. Whaley
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Garfinkle
Represented By: Paul S. Arrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Specialty Retail Shops Holding Corp.
Represented By: James J. Niemeier
Represented By: Patrick J. Nash, Jr.
Represented By: Lauren R. Goodman
Represented By: Michael T. Eversden
Represented By: George W. Hicks, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: U.S. Bankruptcy Court
Represented By: U.S. Bankruptcy Clerk - Omaha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?