Bernholt et al v. Allen et al
Plaintiff: Bernholt Design Solutions, Inc. and John Bernholt
Defendant: MMIS Holdings, LLC, John Allen, ABP Engineering LLC, Midwest Mechanical Industrial Services, LLC, ABP Engineering, LLC and Jeff Allen
Case Number: 8:2019cv00419
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Brian C Buescher
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 12/2/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
October 31, 2019 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Kristin M.V. Krueger on behalf of Defendant Jeff Allen.(Krueger, Kristin)
October 31, 2019 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Kristin M.V. Krueger on behalf of Defendant MMIS Holdings, LLC.(Krueger, Kristin)
October 31, 2019 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Kristin M.V. Krueger on behalf of Defendant Midwest Mechanical Industrial Services, LLC.(Krueger, Kristin)
October 31, 2019 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Kristin M.V. Krueger on behalf of Defendant ABP Engineering, LLC.(Krueger, Kristin)
October 31, 2019 Filing 15 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by ABP Engineering, LLC, Jeff Allen, MMIS Holdings, LLC, Midwest Mechanical Industrial Services, LLC (Krueger, Kristin)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting the parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. On or before November 1, 2019 Defendants shall file their answer or other responsive pleadings. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (ALW)
October 9, 2019 Filing 13 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Kristin M.V. Krueger on behalf of Defendant ABP Engineering, LLC.(Krueger, Kristin)
September 24, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued (COPY) as to defendant Jeff Allen regarding Complaint #1 . YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (MLF)
September 24, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Requested as to Jeff Allen regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement #2 , Complaint #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 . (Eckhoff, Krista)
September 23, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to defendant Jeff Allen. (Eckhoff, Krista) Modified on 9/23/2019 to correct defendant's name (MKR).
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LAC)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to defendant ABP Engineering LLC, Jeff Allen, MMIS Holdings, LLC and Midwest Mechanical Industrial Services, LLC regarding Complaint #1 . YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (MKR) Modified on 9/23/2019 to correct defendant's name from John Allen to Jeff Allen (MKR).
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Requested as to Midwest Mechanical Industrial Services, LLC regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement #2 , Complaint #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 . (Eckhoff, Krista)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Requested as to MMIS Holdings, LLC regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement #2 , Complaint #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 . (Eckhoff, Krista)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Requested as to ABP Engineering, LLC regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement #2 , Complaint #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 . (Eckhoff, Krista)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to Jeff Allen regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement #2 , Complaint #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 . (Eckhoff, Krista) Modified on 9/23/2019 to correct defendant's name (MKR).
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 John Bernholt by Attorney Krista M. Eckhoff on behalf of Plaintiffs John Bernholt, Bernholt Design Solutions, Inc..(Eckhoff, Krista)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 Bernholt Design Solutions, Inc. by Attorney Krista M. Eckhoff on behalf of Plaintiffs John Bernholt, Bernholt Design Solutions, Inc..(Eckhoff, Krista)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4023126), by Attorney Krista M. Eckhoff on behalf of John Bernholt, Bernholt Design Solutions, Inc.(Eckhoff, Krista)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bernholt et al v. Allen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MMIS Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Casandra M. Langstaff
Represented By: Kristin M.V. Krueger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABP Engineering LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Mechanical Industrial Services, LLC
Represented By: Casandra M. Langstaff
Represented By: Kristin M.V. Krueger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABP Engineering, LLC
Represented By: Casandra M. Langstaff
Represented By: Kristin M.V. Krueger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Allen
Represented By: Casandra M. Langstaff
Represented By: Kristin M.V. Krueger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernholt Design Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Krista M. Eckhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Bernholt
Represented By: Krista M. Eckhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?