Guss v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Corinne A. Guss
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 8:2019cv00421
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Susan M Bazis
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #7 for attorney Daniel Ryan. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
November 6, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #8 for attorney James Brodzik. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4052667 by Attorney James M. Brodzik on behalf of Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(Brodzik, James)
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4052658 by Attorney Daniel K. Ryan on behalf of Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(Ryan, Daniel)
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Matthew D. Quandt on behalf of Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(Quandt, Matthew)
October 17, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(ADB)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. Waiver sent on 9/25/2019. (Quandt, Matthew)
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Matthew D. Quandt on behalf of Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America (Quandt, Matthew)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LAC)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4024046), by Attorney Steven M. Lathrop on behalf of Corinne A. Guss(Lathrop, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guss v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Matthew D. Quandt
Represented By: Daniel K. Ryan
Represented By: James M. Brodzik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corinne A. Guss
Represented By: Steven M. Lathrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?