Alpine Building, LLC et al v. Applied Underwriters, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Grove Creek and Alpine Building
Defendant: California Insurance, Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance, Applied Underwriters and Does 1 through 10
Case Number: 8:2019cv00427
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 49 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Grove Creek. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
September 30, 2019 Filing 48 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Alpine Building. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
September 30, 2019 Filing 47 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Michael S. Anderson has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
September 30, 2019 Filing 46 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Jeffrey J. Hunt has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
September 30, 2019 Filing 45 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Jeanette T. Barzelay has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
September 30, 2019 Filing 44 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney David C. Reymann has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
September 30, 2019 Filing 43 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Amanda L. Morgan has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
September 30, 2019 Filing 42 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Larry J. Lichtenegger has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
September 30, 2019 Filing 41 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Shawn P. Bailey has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
September 30, 2019 Filing 40 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Brandon J. Baxter has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
September 30, 2019 Filing 39 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
September 30, 2019 Filing 38 Case transferred in from District of Utah; Case Number 2:18-cv-00805. Original electronic file received.
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Change Venue. This action is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of Nebraska (Omaha). Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 9/27/2019. (jds) [Transferred from Utah on 9/30/2019.]
January 13, 2019 Filing 36 REQUEST to Submit for Decision re #18 MOTION to Change Venue and Memorandum in Support re: Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Defendants Applied Underwriters, Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance, California Insurance. (Reymann, David) [Transferred from Utah on 9/30/2019.]
December 31, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order #31 filed by Plaintiffs Alpine Building, Grove Creek (Bailey, Shawn) [Transferred from Utah on 9/30/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 34 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION to Change Venue and Memorandum in Support re: Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Defendants Applied Underwriters, Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance, California Insurance. (Reymann, David) [Transferred from Utah on 9/30/2019.]
December 14, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order #31 filed by Defendants Applied Underwriters, Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance, California Insurance (Reymann, David) [Transferred from Utah on 9/30/2019.]
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 12/14/18. (ss) [Transferred from Utah on 9/30/2019.]
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 CIVIL STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 12/13/18. (ss) [Transferred from Utah on 9/30/2019.]
December 13, 2018 Filing 30 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner no longer assigned to the case. (las) [Transferred from Utah on 9/30/2019.]
December 13, 2018 Filing 29 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiffs Alpine Building, Grove Creek. (las) [Transferred from Utah on 9/30/2019.]
December 12, 2018 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Change Venue and Memorandum in Support re: Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Plaintiffs Alpine Building, Grove Creek. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Cory Atkinson, #2 Exhibit 2 - Reinsurance Participation Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Producer's Quote Transmittal, #4 Exhibit 4 - Worker's Compensation Program Summary & Scenarios, #5 Exhibit 5 - California Insurance Company Policy)(Bailey, Shawn) [Transferred from Utah on 9/30/2019.]
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time re: Scheduling Dates. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 12/10/2018. (las) [Transferred from Utah on 9/30/2019.]
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeanette Barzelay for Applied Underwriters,Jeanette Barzelay for Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance,Jeanette Barzelay for California Insurance. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 12/7/2018. (las) [Transferred from Utah on 9/30/2019.]
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Amanda L. Morgan for Applied Underwriters,Amanda L. Morgan for Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance,Amanda L. Morgan for California Insurance. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 12/7/2018. (las) [Transferred from Utah on 9/30/2019.]
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Shand Scott Stephens for Applied Underwriters,Shand Scott Stephens for Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance,Shand Scott Stephens for California Insurance. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 12/7/2018. (las) [Transferred from Utah on 9/30/2019.]
December 7, 2018 Filing 23 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time re: Scheduling Dates filed by Defendants Applied Underwriters, Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance, California Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reymann, David) [Transferred from Utah on 9/30/2019.]
November 29, 2018 Filing 22 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants Applied Underwriters, Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance, California Insurance. (las) [Transferred from Utah on 9/30/2019.]
November 28, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. Anderson on behalf of Applied Underwriters, Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance, California Insurance (Anderson, Michael) [Transferred from Utah on 9/30/2019.]
November 28, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Alpine Building, Grove Creek, Defendants Applied Underwriters, Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance, California Insurance. Form due by 12/13/2018. (las) [Transferred from Utah on 9/30/2019.]
November 28, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Alpine Building, Grove Creek, Defendants Applied Underwriters, Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance, California Insurance. (las) [Transferred from Utah on 9/30/2019.]
November 28, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION to Change Venue and Memorandum in Support re: Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Defendants Applied Underwriters, Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance, California Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Travis J. Koch)(Reymann, David) [Transferred from Utah on 9/30/2019.]
November 28, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeanette T. Barzelay , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3154481, filed by Defendants Applied Underwriters, Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance, California Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Application and ECF Registration, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Reymann, David) [Transferred from Utah on 9/30/2019.]
November 28, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Amanda L. Morgan , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3154479, filed by Defendants Applied Underwriters, Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance, California Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Reymann, David) [Transferred from Utah on 9/30/2019.]
November 28, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Shand S. Stephens , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3154469, filed by Defendants Applied Underwriters, Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance, California Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Application and ECF Registration), #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Reymann, David) [Transferred from Utah on 9/30/2019.]
November 28, 2018 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendants Applied Underwriters, Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance, California Insurance identifying Berkshire Hathaway Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Reymann, David) [Transferred from Utah on 9/30/2019.]
November 28, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey J. Hunt on behalf of Applied Underwriters, Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance, California Insurance (Hunt, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Utah on 9/30/2019.]
November 28, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by David C. Reymann on behalf of Applied Underwriters, Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance, California Insurance (Reymann, David) [Transferred from Utah on 9/30/2019.]
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Larry J. Lichtenegger for Alpine Building,Larry J. Lichtenegger for Grove Creek. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 11/5/2018. (las) [Transferred from Utah on 9/30/2019.]
November 5, 2018 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Grove Creek, Alpine Building as to California Insurance served on 10/23/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. (Bailey, Shawn) [Transferred from Utah on 9/30/2019.]
November 5, 2018 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Grove Creek, Alpine Building as to Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance served on 10/17/2018, answer due 11/7/2018. (Bailey, Shawn) [Transferred from Utah on 9/30/2019.]
November 5, 2018 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Grove Creek, Alpine Building as to Applied Underwriters served on 10/17/2018, answer due 11/7/2018. (Bailey, Shawn) [Transferred from Utah on 9/30/2019.]
October 31, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Larry J. Lichtenegger and Consent of Local Counsel, Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3136533, filed by Plaintiffs Alpine Building, Grove Creek. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Exhibit B - ECF Registration Form, #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order)(Bailey, Shawn) [Transferred from Utah on 9/30/2019.]
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 10/17/2018. (las) [Transferred from Utah on 9/30/2019.]
October 15, 2018 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh) [Transferred from Utah on 9/30/2019.]
October 15, 2018 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Applied Underwriters. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh) [Transferred from Utah on 9/30/2019.]
October 15, 2018 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to California Insurance. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh) [Transferred from Utah on 9/30/2019.]
October 15, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3123928) filed by Grove Creek, Alpine Building. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner (Baxter, Brandon) [Transferred from Utah on 9/30/2019.]
October 15, 2018 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner. Plaintiffs Alpine Building and Grove Creek are directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh) [Transferred from Utah on 9/30/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alpine Building, LLC et al v. Applied Underwriters, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Insurance
Represented By: David C. Reymann
Represented By: Shand S. Stephens
Represented By: Amanda L. Morgan
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Hunt
Represented By: Jeanette T. Barzelay
Represented By: Michael S. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance
Represented By: David C. Reymann
Represented By: Shand S. Stephens
Represented By: Amanda L. Morgan
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Hunt
Represented By: Jeanette T. Barzelay
Represented By: Michael S. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Applied Underwriters
Represented By: David C. Reymann
Represented By: Shand S. Stephens
Represented By: Amanda L. Morgan
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Hunt
Represented By: Jeanette T. Barzelay
Represented By: Michael S. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grove Creek
Represented By: Shawn P. Bailey
Represented By: Brandon J. Baxter
Represented By: Larry J. Lichtenegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alpine Building
Represented By: Shawn P. Bailey
Represented By: Brandon J. Baxter
Represented By: Larry J. Lichtenegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?