Sands v. BH Media Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Steve Sands
Defendant: BH Media Group, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv00442
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PROTECTIVE ORDER - Upon consideration of the parties' joint request for entry of a Protective Order, (Filing No. #10 ), the Court enters the following Protective Order governing the disclosure of confidential Discovery Material by a Producing Party to a Receiving Party in this Action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PROGRESSION ORDER - The deposition deadline is May 29, 2020. The trial and pretrial conference will not be set at this time. A status conference to discuss case progression, the parties' interest in settlement, and the trial and pretrial conference settings will be held with the undersigned magistrate judge on May 5, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. by telephone. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
December 3, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting - Settlement Likely by Attorney Michael C. Cox on behalf of Defendant BH Media Group, Inc..(Cox, Michael)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RESTRICTED CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (KLF)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 12/5/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (KLF)
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Credit Corporation, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for BH Media Group, Inc.. by Attorney Michael C. Cox on behalf of Defendants BH Media Group, Inc., Berkshire Hathaway Credit Corporation, Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Berkshire Hathaway, Inc..(Cox, Michael)
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by BH Media Group, Inc. (Cox, Michael)
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Copyright Infringement (original form mailed to the Office of Register of Copyrights with a copy of complaint #1 ). (KMM)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued (COPY) as to defendant BH Media Group, Inc. regarding YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (KMM)
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (KMM)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to BH Media Group, Inc. regarding Complaint, #1 . (Liebowitz, Richard)
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against BH Media Group, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4035860), by Attorney Richard P. Liebowitz on behalf of Steve Sands (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sands v. BH Media Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Sands
Represented By: Richard P. Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BH Media Group, Inc.
Represented By: Michael C. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?