Harvest Roasting, LLC v. US Roaster Corp
Plaintiff: Harvest Roasting, LLC
Defendant: US Roaster Corp.
Case Number: 8:2019cv00444
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (ADB)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER : Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 1/6/2020.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (ADB)
December 5, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by US Roaster Corp. (Jochim, Scott)
November 4, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant US Roaster Corp. on 10/31/2019. (Kennison, David) Modified on 11/4/2019 to reflect correct party (LKO).
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by December 5, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
November 1, 2019 Filing 10 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Scott D. Jochim on behalf of Defendant US Roaster Corp..(Jochim, Scott)
November 1, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Scott D. Jochim on behalf of Defendant US Roaster Corp..(Jochim, Scott)
November 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Matthew W. Harris on behalf of Defendant US Roaster Corp. (Harris, Matthew)
November 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Scott D. Jochim on behalf of Defendant US Roaster Corp. (Jochim, Scott)
October 14, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney David P. Kennison on behalf of Plaintiff Harvest Roasting, LLC.(Kennison, David)
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Harvest Roasting, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (KMM)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued (COPY) as to defendant US Roaster Corp. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (KMM)
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (KMM)
October 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to US Roaster Corp c/o Daniel D. Jolliff, Regisered Agent regarding Complaint, #1 . (Tricker, Jennifer)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against US Roaster Corp ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4036208), by Attorney Jennifer D. Tricker on behalf of Harvest Roasting, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 US Roaster Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 US Roaster Notice of Breach)(Tricker, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harvest Roasting, LLC v. US Roaster Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harvest Roasting, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer D. Tricker
Represented By: David P. Kennison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Roaster Corp.
Represented By: Scott D. Jochim
Represented By: Matthew W. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?