Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT v. Union Pacific Railroad
Plaintiff: Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 8:2019cv00466
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Brian C Buescher
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 45:151
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER regarding Application for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically #8 . Pro Hac Vice admission fee in the amount of $100.00 is refunded to the payor, Donald Munro, receipt number ANEDC-4055006. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
November 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Christopher R. Hedican on behalf of Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company (Hedican, Christopher)
November 13, 2019 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Refund of pro hac vice admission fee paid electronically by Attorney Donald J. Munro on behalf of Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company.(Munro, Donald)
November 12, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #5 for attorney Donald Munro. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #4 for attorney Nikki McArthur. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
November 11, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4055006 by Attorney Donald J. Munro on behalf of Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company.(Munro, Donald)
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4054719 by Attorney Nikki L. McArthur on behalf of Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company.(McArthur, Nikki)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. Waiver sent on 10/28/2019. (O'Connor, Robert)
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Union Pacific Railroad ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4043985), by Attorney Robert E. O'Connor, Jr. on behalf of Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT (O'Connor, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT v. Union Pacific Railroad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Christopher R. Hedican
Represented By: Nikki L. McArthur
Represented By: Donald J. Munro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT
Represented By: Richard S. Edelman
Represented By: Robert E. O'Connor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?