Williams-Ferguson v. Saul
Plaintiff: Elainer N. Williams-Ferguson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Case Number: 8:2019cv00468
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Brian C Buescher
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney General, Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, and U.S. Attorney's Office. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Requested as to Comm'r, Soc. Sec. regarding Complaint #1 , Memorandum and Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,, #5 . (Kappelman, Wes)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Filing #2 ) is approved. Plaintiff may proceed in this matter without prepaying fees or costs. This order is entered without prejudice to the court later entering an order taxing costs in this case. No one, including any plaintiff, is relieved by this order from the obligation to pay or to reimburse taxable costs after this action is over. Ordered by Judge Brian C. Buescher. (TCL)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 GENERAL ORDER NO. 2015-05: In the Matter of Procedures for Social Security Cases. Ordered by Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (LKO)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Judge Brian C. Buescher assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Attorney Wes Kappelman on behalf of Plaintiff Elainer N. Williams-Ferguson.(Kappelman, Wes)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, by Attorney Wes Kappelman on behalf of Elainer N. Williams-Ferguson (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kappelman, Wes)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams-Ferguson v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elainer N. Williams-Ferguson
Represented By: Timothy J. Cuddigan
Represented By: Wes Kappelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Represented By: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?