Gray v. Frakes et al
Petitioner: Graylin Gray
Respondent: Todd Wasmer and Scott R. Frakes
Case Number: 8:2019cv00490
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Referring Judge: Richard G Kopf
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability on behalf of Petitioner Graylin Gray.(ADB)
January 2, 2020 Filing 11 PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Petitioner Graylin Gray. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (ADB)
January 2, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis on behalf of Petitioner Graylin Gray.(ADB)
January 2, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEAL regarding Judgment - Pro Se #8 , Memorandum and Order #7 on behalf of Petitioner Graylin Gray. (copy mailed to pro se party) (ADB)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 JUDGMENT - PRO SE : Pursuant to the Memorandum and Order entered this date, the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is dismissed without prejudice, and the court will not issue a certificate of appealability in this matter. (Attachments: #1 Notice - Civil Appeals in Pro Se Cases) Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (ADB)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the petition for writ of habeas corpus (filing no. 1) is denied and dismissed without prejudice to reassertion in a petition for writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254 properly authorized by the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals. No certificate of appealability has been or will be issued. Petitioner's objection (filing no. 6), docketed as a motion, is denied. Judgment will be entered by separate document. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (ADB)
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 OBJECTION to Memorandum and Order #5 on behalf of Petitioner Graylin Gray.(TCL)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. It is ordered that Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #2 is granted. The next step in this case is for the court to conduct a preliminary review of the habeas corpus petition in accordance with Rule 4 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 cases. The court will conduct this review in its normal course of business.Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party)(KLL)
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (ADB)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Petitioner Graylin Gray. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (ADB)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Petitioner Graylin Gray. (ADB)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Graylin Gray. (ADB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray v. Frakes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Todd Wasmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scott R. Frakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Graylin Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?