Real Radiology, LLC v. Weger et al
Plaintiff: Real Radiology, LLC
Defendant: Donovan Weger and Arthur J. Gallagher & Co.
Case Number: 8:2019cv00493
Filed: November 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. For good cause shown, Defendants shall have an extension of time to February 3, 2020, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
December 31, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Brandon J. Crainer on behalf of Defendants Arthur J. Gallagher & Co., Donovan Weger.(Crainer, Brandon)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendants shall have an extension of time to January 3, 2020, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
December 12, 2019 Filing 8 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Brandon J. Crainer on behalf of Defendants Arthur J. Gallagher & Co., Donovan Weger.(Crainer, Brandon)
December 6, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Donovan Weger on 11/19/2019. (Hale, William)
December 6, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Arthur J. Gallagher & Co. on 11/18/2019. (Hale, William)
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Real Radiology, LLC for Real Radiology, LLC. by Attorney William J. Hale on behalf of Plaintiffs Real Radiology, LLC, Real Radiology, LLC.(Hale, William)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Real Radiology, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (KLF)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to defendants Arthur J. Gallagher & Co. and Donovan Weger. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (KLF)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (KLF)
November 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4055030), by Attorney William J. Hale on behalf of Real Radiology, LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 E-mail to Clerk Summons for Defendant Weger, #3 E-mail to Clerk Summons for Defendant Arthur J. Gallagher & Co)(Hale, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Real Radiology, LLC v. Weger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donovan Weger
Represented By: Brandon J. Crainer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur J. Gallagher & Co.
Represented By: Brandon J. Crainer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Real Radiology, LLC
Represented By: William J. Hale
Represented By: Daniel J. Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?