In re Specialty Retail Shops Holding Corp. et al
Defendant: Sun Capital Management, LLC, KLA-Shopko, LLC, Sun Capital Partners, IV, LP and Sun Capital Partners Group, Inc.
Debtor: Specialty Retail Shops Holding Corp. and SKO Group Holding Corp.
Not Yet Classified: CGP Seymour, LTD., CGP Prosser, LLC, CGP Clilfton, LTD., CGP Comanche, LTD., CGP Canadian, LTD, CGP Cotulla, LTD., GGSK Tulia, LTD., Official Unsecured Creditors' Committee, CGP Jacksboro, LTD. and CGP Orofino, LLC
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Interested Party: U.S. Bankruptcy Court
Case Number: 8:2019cv00504
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 29 BRIEF (OPENING BRIEF OF APPELLANTS) by Attorney Lee R. Benton on behalf of Creditors CGP Canadian, LTD, CGP Clilfton, LTD., CGP Comanche, LTD., CGP Cotulla, LTD., CGP Jacksboro, LTD., CGP Orofino, LLC, CGP Prosser, LLC, CGP Seymour, LTD., GGSK Tulia, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Appendix Appellants' Excerpts of Records)(Benton, Lee)
December 31, 2019 Filing 28 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #27 for attorney Stephen J. Kastenberg. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
December 30, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4082904 by Attorney Stephen J. Kastenberg on behalf of Defendant KLA-Shopko, LLC.(Kastenberg, Stephen)
December 20, 2019 Filing 26 SUPPLEMENT regarding Bankruptcy Record on Appeal #8 (APPELLANTS' SUBMISSION OF TRANSCRIPT TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD ON APPEAL) by Attorney Lee R. Benton on behalf of Creditors CGP Canadian, LTD, CGP Clilfton, LTD., CGP Comanche, LTD., CGP Cotulla, LTD., CGP Jacksboro, LTD., CGP Orofino, LLC, CGP Prosser, LLC, CGP Seymour, LTD., GGSK Tulia, LTD..(Benton, Lee)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ORDER - Per the parties' Stipulation and Request for Order Scheduling Briefing Deadlines #17 filed by Sun Capital Partners Group, Inc., Sun Capital Partners, IV, LP, and Sun Capital Management, LLC, the parties shall file briefs with the following deadlines: appellants must serve and file their opening brief by January 15, 2020. The appellees must serve and file a brief by February 14, 2020. Any reply brief by the appellants must be served and filed by February 28, 2020.Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (JSF)
December 20, 2019 Filing 24 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Samuel C. Stephens has not registered for admittance to practice. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (TCL)
December 20, 2019 Filing 23 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Bradford J. Sandler has not registered for admittance to practice. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (TCL)
December 20, 2019 Filing 22 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Jefrrey N. Pomerantz has not registered for admittance to practice. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (TCL)
December 20, 2019 Filing 21 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Patrick J. Nash has not registered for admittance to practice. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (TCL)
December 20, 2019 Filing 20 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Alan J. Kornfeld has not registered for admittance to practice. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (TCL)
December 20, 2019 Filing 19 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Robert J. Feinstein has not registered for admittance to practice. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (TCL)
December 19, 2019 Filing 18 Certificate of Service by Attorney Andrew J. Gallo on behalf of Defendants Sun Capital Management, LLC, Sun Capital Partners Group, Inc., Sun Capital Partners, IV, LP.(Gallo, Andrew)
December 19, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION and Request for Order Scheduling Briefing Deadlines by Attorney Andrew J. Gallo on behalf of Defendants Sun Capital Management, LLC, Sun Capital Partners Group, Inc., Sun Capital Partners, IV, LP.(Gallo, Andrew)
December 19, 2019 Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #14 for attorney Lee R. Benton. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
December 19, 2019 Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #11 for attorney Andrew J. Gallo. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
December 19, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4078809 by Attorney Lee R. Benton on behalf of Creditors CGP Canadian, LTD, CGP Clilfton, LTD., CGP Comanche, LTD., CGP Cotulla, LTD., CGP Jacksboro, LTD., CGP Orofino, LLC, CGP Prosser, LLC, CGP Seymour, LTD., GGSK Tulia, LTD..(Benton, Lee)
December 18, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Courtney L. Yeakal has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (TCL)
December 18, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Stephen J. Kastenberg has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (TCL)
December 18, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4078273 by Attorney Andrew J. Gallo on behalf of Defendants Sun Capital Management, LLC, Sun Capital Partners Group, Inc., Sun Capital Partners, IV, LP.(Gallo, Andrew)
December 10, 2019 Filing 10 LETTER by Clerk USBC-case no. 19-80064 transmitting Supplement Record on Appeal - Third Appellant Designation at filing no. 2100. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Designation)(ADB)
November 27, 2019 Filing 9 Transmittal LETTER by USBC-NE, case no. 19-80064-TLS of supplemental record on appeal. (Attachments: #1 Appellants' Notice that the Transcript of Proceedings has been ordered)(ADB)
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 Appellants' Designation of Record on Appeal - Bankruptcy Court case number 19-80064-TLS. (ADB)
November 27, 2019 Filing 7 STATEMENT OF ISSUES ON APPEAL by Attorney Lee R. Benton on behalf of Creditors CGP Canadian, LTD, CGP Clilfton, LTD., CGP Comanche, LTD., CGP Cotulla, LTD., CGP Jacksboro, LTD., CGP Orofino, LLC, CGP Prosser, LLC, CGP Seymour, LTD., GGSK Tulia, LTD..(ADB)
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 Transmittal LETTER by USBC-NE 19-80064-TLS of the Statement of Issues at filing 2083 and appellant's designation at filing 2084 . (ADB)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT STRIKE ORDER that Pursuant to NEGenR 1.3(a)(4), the Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record #2 is stricken for the following reason(s) incorrect document attached: Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (TCL)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REASSIGNMENT ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to District Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. for disposition. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (TCL)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 TRANSMISSION OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL RECORD re #1 Notice of Filing Bankruptcy with bankruptcy sheet from USBC-Nebraska, Case Number BK 19-80064. (Attachments: #1 BK 19-80064)(TCL)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 STRICKEN - TRANSMISSION OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL RECORD re #1 Notice of Filing Bankruptcy with bankruptcy docket sheets from USBC-Nebraska, case Number ADV 18-19-08002, BK 19-80064 (Attachments: #1 ADV 19-08002, #2 BK 19-80064)(TCL) Modified on 11/19/2019 to add "stricken" text pursuant to Order 4 . (JAB)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Filing Bankruptcy Appeal. (TCL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re Specialty Retail Shops Holding Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Specialty Retail Shops Holding Corp.
Represented By: James J. Niemeier
Represented By: Patrick J. Nash, Jr.
Represented By: Lauren R. Goodman
Represented By: Michael T. Eversden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: SKO Group Holding Corp.
Represented By: James J. Niemeier
Represented By: Patrick J. Nash, Jr.
Represented By: Lauren R. Goodman
Represented By: Michael T. Eversden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CGP Seymour, LTD.
Represented By: Samuel C. Stephens
Represented By: Lee R. Benton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CGP Prosser, LLC
Represented By: Samuel C. Stephens
Represented By: Lee R. Benton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CGP Clilfton, LTD.
Represented By: Samuel C. Stephens
Represented By: Lee R. Benton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CGP Comanche, LTD.
Represented By: Samuel C. Stephens
Represented By: Lee R. Benton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CGP Canadian, LTD
Represented By: Samuel C. Stephens
Represented By: Lee R. Benton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CGP Cotulla, LTD.
Represented By: Samuel C. Stephens
Represented By: Lee R. Benton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: GGSK Tulia, LTD.
Represented By: Samuel C. Stephens
Represented By: Lee R. Benton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Official Unsecured Creditors' Committee
Represented By: Alan J. Kornfeld
Represented By: Robert J. Feinstein
Represented By: Joel M. Carney
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Pomerantz
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Lally
Represented By: Bradford J. Sandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CGP Jacksboro, LTD.
Represented By: Samuel C. Stephens
Represented By: Lee R. Benton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CGP Orofino, LLC
Represented By: Samuel C. Stephens
Represented By: Lee R. Benton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: Jerry L. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: U.S. Bankruptcy Court
Represented By: U.S. Bankruptcy Clerk - Omaha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Capital Management, LLC
Represented By: Andrew J. Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KLA-Shopko, LLC
Represented By: Stephen J. Kastenberg
Represented By: Courtney L. Yeakal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Capital Partners, IV, LP
Represented By: Andrew J. Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Capital Partners Group, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew J. Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?