Paladino et al v. Chubb Custom Insurance Company
Plaintiff: 17th Street LLC, Pine Park Apartments, 20th Street LLC, Hamilton Street LLC, Paris Investments, LLC, Anderson Apartments LLC, Hamilton Street, LLC, 5132 NWR LLC, Landmark Management Group, Inc., St. Mary's Apartments L.L.C., Paladino Related Companies LLC, Landmark Real Estate, 44th Street LLC, Bayview Apartments, LLC, 44th Street, L.L.C., North Omaha LLC, Chops Holdings, 5132 NWR, LLC, David J. Paladino, Bayview Apartments LLC, North Omaha, LLC, Pine Park Properties, LLC, St. Mary's Apartment LLC, Paris Investments, PL Partnership, Chops Holdings LLC and Paladino Development Group
Defendant: Chubb Custom Insurance Company
Case Number: 8:2019cv00530
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (TCL)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 2/10/2020.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (TCL)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. #35 , is granted. All claims against Defendant Chubb Custom Insurance Company brought by Plaintiffs Landmark Real Estate and Pine Park Apartments are dismissed, without prejudice. Plaintiffs Landmark Real Estate and Pine Park Apartments are dismissed from the above-captioned case. The Clerk will revise the caption accordingly. Ordered by Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (TCL)
January 7, 2020 Filing 35 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Attorney Sean M. Patterson on behalf of Plaintiffs 17th Street LLC, 20th Street LLC, 44th Street LLC, 44th Street, L.L.C., 5132 NWR LLC, 5132 NWR, LLC, Anderson Apartments LLC, Bayview Apartments LLC, Bayview Apartments, LLC, Chops Holdings, Chops Holdings LLC, Hamilton Street LLC, Hamilton Street, LLC, Landmark Management Group, Inc., Landmark Real Estate, North Omaha LLC, North Omaha, LLC, PL Partnership, David J. Paladino, Paladino Development Group, Paladino Related Companies LLC, Paris Investments, Paris Investments, LLC, Pine Park Apartments, Pine Park Properties, LLC, St. Mary's Apartment LLC, St. Mary's Apartments L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Patterson, Sean)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Derek L. Fadner, James M. McClenny, and John C. Moseley are stricken as attorneys of record for the Plaintiffs. Said attorneys may apply to be readmitted as an attorney of record only after registering for admission to practice in this court. The Clerk of Court shall terminate Derek L. Fadner, James M. McClenny, and John C. Moseley as counsel of record. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (TCL)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE that on or before January 3, 2020, Attorneys Derek L. Fadner, James M. McClenny, and John C. Moseley shall comply with letters to register for admittance to practice or show cause by written affidavit why they cannot comply with the rules of the Court. Failure to comply with this order will result in being removed as counsel of record. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (ADB)
December 20, 2019 Filing 32 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #31 for attorney Sean M. Patterson. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
December 19, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4079509 by Attorney Sean M. Patterson on behalf of Plaintiffs 17th Street LLC, 20th Street LLC, 44th Street LLC, 44th Street, L.L.C., 5132 NWR LLC, 5132 NWR, LLC, Anderson Apartments LLC, Bayview Apartments LLC, Bayview Apartments, LLC, Chops Holdings, Chops Holdings LLC, Hamilton Street LLC, Hamilton Street, LLC, Landmark Management Group, Inc., Landmark Real Estate, North Omaha LLC, North Omaha, LLC, PL Partnership, David J. Paladino, Paladino Development Group, Paladino Related Companies LLC, Paris Investments, Paris Investments, LLC, Pine Park Apartments, Pine Park Properties, LLC, St. Mary's Apartment LLC, St. Mary's Apartments L.L.C..(Patterson, Sean)
December 19, 2019 Filing 30 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Sean M. Patterson has not registered for admittance to practice. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
December 17, 2019 Filing 29 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Sean M. Patterson on behalf of Plaintiffs St. Mary's Apartment LLC, St. Mary's Apartments L.L.C., Bayview Apartments LLC, Paris Investments, Landmark Real Estate, Paladino Related Companies LLC, PL Partnership, North Omaha, LLC, Chops Holdings, 5132 NWR, LLC, Landmark Management Group, Inc., 17th Street LLC, North Omaha LLC, 44th Street LLC, David J. Paladino, Anderson Apartments LLC, Bayview Apartments, LLC, Pine Park Properties, LLC, Chops Holdings LLC, Hamilton Street LLC, 20th Street LLC, 44th Street, L.L.C., Hamilton Street, LLC, Pine Park Apartments, Paris Investments, LLC, 5132 NWR LLC, Paladino Development Group.(Patterson, Sean)
December 12, 2019 Filing 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Brooke H. McCarthy on behalf of Defendant Chubb Custom Insurance Company.(McCarthy, Brooke)
December 2, 2019 Filing 27 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff St. Mary's Apartments L.L.C.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LKO)
December 2, 2019 Filing 26 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff St. Mary's Apartment LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LKO)
December 2, 2019 Filing 25 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Pine Park Properties, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LKO)
December 2, 2019 Filing 24 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Paris Investments, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LKO)
December 2, 2019 Filing 23 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Paladino Related Companies LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LKO)
December 2, 2019 Filing 22 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff North Omaha, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LKO)
December 2, 2019 Filing 21 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff North Omaha LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LKO)
December 2, 2019 Filing 20 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Landmark Management Group, Inc.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LKO)
December 2, 2019 Filing 19 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Hamilton Street, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LKO)
December 2, 2019 Filing 18 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Hamilton Street LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LKO)
December 2, 2019 Filing 17 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Chubb Custom Insurance Company. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LKO)
December 2, 2019 Filing 16 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Chops Holdings LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LKO)
December 2, 2019 Filing 15 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Bayview Apartments, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LKO)
December 2, 2019 Filing 14 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Bayview Apartments LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
December 2, 2019 Filing 13 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Anderson Apartments LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
December 2, 2019 Filing 12 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff 5132 NWR, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
December 2, 2019 Filing 11 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff 5132 NWR LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
December 2, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff 44th Street, L.L.C.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
December 2, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff 44th Street LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff 20th Street LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff 17th Street LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Joselyn Marroquin has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
December 2, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney John Z. Moseley has not registered for admittance to practice. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
December 2, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney James M. McClenny has not registered for admittance to practice. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Derek L. Fadner has not registered for admittance to practice. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
December 2, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
December 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against All Plaintiffs from District Court of Douglas County, Nebraska, Case number CI 19-5205 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4067662) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Brooke H. McCarthy on behalf of Chubb Custom Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(McCarthy, Brooke)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paladino et al v. Chubb Custom Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 17th Street LLC
Represented By: John Z. Moseley
Represented By: James M. McClenny
Represented By: Ryan M. Sewell
Represented By: Derek L. Fadner
Represented By: Sean M. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pine Park Apartments
Represented By: John Z. Moseley
Represented By: James M. McClenny
Represented By: Ryan M. Sewell
Represented By: Derek L. Fadner
Represented By: Sean M. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 20th Street LLC
Represented By: John Z. Moseley
Represented By: James M. McClenny
Represented By: Ryan M. Sewell
Represented By: Derek L. Fadner
Represented By: Sean M. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hamilton Street LLC
Represented By: John Z. Moseley
Represented By: James M. McClenny
Represented By: Ryan M. Sewell
Represented By: Derek L. Fadner
Represented By: Sean M. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paris Investments, LLC
Represented By: John Z. Moseley
Represented By: James M. McClenny
Represented By: Ryan M. Sewell
Represented By: Derek L. Fadner
Represented By: Sean M. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anderson Apartments LLC
Represented By: John Z. Moseley
Represented By: James M. McClenny
Represented By: Ryan M. Sewell
Represented By: Derek L. Fadner
Represented By: Sean M. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hamilton Street, LLC
Represented By: John Z. Moseley
Represented By: James M. McClenny
Represented By: Ryan M. Sewell
Represented By: Derek L. Fadner
Represented By: Sean M. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 5132 NWR LLC
Represented By: John Z. Moseley
Represented By: James M. McClenny
Represented By: Ryan M. Sewell
Represented By: Derek L. Fadner
Represented By: Sean M. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Landmark Management Group, Inc.
Represented By: John Z. Moseley
Represented By: James M. McClenny
Represented By: Ryan M. Sewell
Represented By: Derek L. Fadner
Represented By: Sean M. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Mary's Apartments L.L.C.
Represented By: John Z. Moseley
Represented By: James M. McClenny
Represented By: Ryan M. Sewell
Represented By: Derek L. Fadner
Represented By: Sean M. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paladino Related Companies LLC
Represented By: John Z. Moseley
Represented By: James M. McClenny
Represented By: Ryan M. Sewell
Represented By: Derek L. Fadner
Represented By: Sean M. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Landmark Real Estate
Represented By: John Z. Moseley
Represented By: James M. McClenny
Represented By: Ryan M. Sewell
Represented By: Derek L. Fadner
Represented By: Sean M. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 44th Street LLC
Represented By: John Z. Moseley
Represented By: James M. McClenny
Represented By: Ryan M. Sewell
Represented By: Derek L. Fadner
Represented By: Sean M. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bayview Apartments, LLC
Represented By: John Z. Moseley
Represented By: James M. McClenny
Represented By: Ryan M. Sewell
Represented By: Derek L. Fadner
Represented By: Sean M. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 44th Street, L.L.C.
Represented By: John Z. Moseley
Represented By: James M. McClenny
Represented By: Ryan M. Sewell
Represented By: Derek L. Fadner
Represented By: Sean M. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Omaha LLC
Represented By: John Z. Moseley
Represented By: James M. McClenny
Represented By: Ryan M. Sewell
Represented By: Derek L. Fadner
Represented By: Sean M. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chops Holdings
Represented By: John Z. Moseley
Represented By: James M. McClenny
Represented By: Ryan M. Sewell
Represented By: Derek L. Fadner
Represented By: Sean M. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 5132 NWR, LLC
Represented By: John Z. Moseley
Represented By: James M. McClenny
Represented By: Ryan M. Sewell
Represented By: Derek L. Fadner
Represented By: Sean M. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David J. Paladino
Represented By: John Z. Moseley
Represented By: James M. McClenny
Represented By: Ryan M. Sewell
Represented By: Derek L. Fadner
Represented By: Sean M. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bayview Apartments LLC
Represented By: John Z. Moseley
Represented By: James M. McClenny
Represented By: Ryan M. Sewell
Represented By: Derek L. Fadner
Represented By: Sean M. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Omaha, LLC
Represented By: John Z. Moseley
Represented By: James M. McClenny
Represented By: Ryan M. Sewell
Represented By: Derek L. Fadner
Represented By: Sean M. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pine Park Properties, LLC
Represented By: John Z. Moseley
Represented By: James M. McClenny
Represented By: Ryan M. Sewell
Represented By: Derek L. Fadner
Represented By: Sean M. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Mary's Apartment LLC
Represented By: John Z. Moseley
Represented By: James M. McClenny
Represented By: Ryan M. Sewell
Represented By: Derek L. Fadner
Represented By: Sean M. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paris Investments
Represented By: John Z. Moseley
Represented By: James M. McClenny
Represented By: Ryan M. Sewell
Represented By: Derek L. Fadner
Represented By: Sean M. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PL Partnership
Represented By: John Z. Moseley
Represented By: James M. McClenny
Represented By: Ryan M. Sewell
Represented By: Derek L. Fadner
Represented By: Sean M. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chops Holdings LLC
Represented By: John Z. Moseley
Represented By: James M. McClenny
Represented By: Ryan M. Sewell
Represented By: Derek L. Fadner
Represented By: Sean M. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paladino Development Group
Represented By: John Z. Moseley
Represented By: James M. McClenny
Represented By: Ryan M. Sewell
Represented By: Derek L. Fadner
Represented By: Sean M. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb Custom Insurance Company
Represented By: Joselyn Marroquin
Represented By: Brooke H. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?