Hernandez v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Maria Hernandez
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 8:2019cv00543
Filed: December 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Brian C Buescher
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 635
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - Depositions due 9/14/20. The trial and pretrial conference will not be set at this time. A telephonic status conference to discuss case progression, the parties' interest in settlement, and the trial and pretrial conference settings will be held with the undersigned magistrate judge on September 15, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. (Filing No. #7 .) Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
January 28, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of regarding DISCLOSURE #9 Notice of Serving Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Attorney Ross R. Pesek on behalf of Plaintiff Maria Hernandez (Pesek, Ross)
January 27, 2020 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE Defendant's Rule 26 Initial Disclosures by Attorney Rex A. Rezac on behalf of Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Rezac, Rex)
January 27, 2020 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Rex A. Rezac on behalf of Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Rezac, Rex)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 1/27/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Rezac, Rex)
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Rex A. Rezac on behalf of Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Rezac, Rex)
December 12, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
December 12, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
December 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from District Court of Douglas County, Nebraska, Case number CI19-8849 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4074058) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Rex A. Rezac on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint and Praecipe, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Michael Roper, #3 Exhibit District Court Pleadings)(Rezac, Rex)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Rex A. Rezac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Hernandez
Represented By: Ross R. Pesek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?