In re Montilla
In Re: AG Processing, Inc. and Ricardo Montilla, IV
Case Number: 8:2019cv00549
Filed: December 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1782
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE regarding Complaint, #1 AGP Brief in Opposition to Ricardo IV Montilla's Ex Parte Application for Assistance to Venezuelan Tribunals by Attorney James G. Powers on behalf of In Re AG Processing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Index of Evidence ISO Opposition to Application, #2 Exhibit 1 Declaration of Juan Carlos Garanton-Blanco w Ex A, #3 Exhibit 2 Declaration of Juan Domingo Alfonzo Paradisi w Ex A, #4 Exhibit 3 SUNAVALs june 2019 Order No 048, #5 Exhibit 4 Dismissal Order No 2019-0037, #6 Exhibit 5 Writ dated January 16 2020, #7 Exhibit 6 Writ dated January 16 2020, #8 Exhibit 7 Writ dated January 23 2020, #9 Exhibit 8 Declaration of Scott Simmelink, #10 Exhibit 9 Affidavit of April Hook w Exs A-M)(Powers, James)
January 20, 2020 Filing 9 Certificate regarding Order on Motion to Extend #8 by Attorney Quinn R. Eaton on behalf of In Re Ricardo Montilla, IV. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Eaton, Quinn)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Applicant's Unopposed Motion for a two-week extension of the deadlines set in Filing No. #6 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CEW)
January 6, 2020 Filing 7 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend Deadline for compliance with the Court's Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,, #6 by Attorney V. Gene Summerlin, Jr. on behalf of In Re Ricardo Montilla, IV.(Summerlin, V.)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that on or before January 6, 2020, applicant Ricardo IV Montilla shall provide a copy of the application and a copy of this Memorandum and Order to the relevant foreign tribunal(s), including the Contentious-Administrative Court of the Capital Region of Venezuela ("Venezuela Court"), and shall file a certificate of service stating when, how, and upon whom the application and order were served. Should the Venezuela Court wish to advise this Court on its position or any concerns with permitting the discovery in the application, it may convey this information by mail to Robert F. Rossiter, Jr., United States District Court Judge, 111 South 18th Plaza, Suite 3141, Omaha, Nebraska 68102. Any such correspondence must be sent by February 5, 2020. This Court will file any correspondence received from the Venezuela tribunal. Ag Processing, Inc.'s Notice of Objection to Ex Parte Application and Motion to Set Objection Deadline (Filing No. #5 ) is granted. On or before January 21, 2020, Ag Processing shall file their response to the application. On or before February 4, 2020, Montilla may file a reply to Ag Processing's response. Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (JSF)
December 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION Notice of Objection to Ex Parte Application and Motion to Set Objection Deadline by Attorney James G. Powers on behalf of In Re AG Processing, Inc..(Powers, James)
December 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney April N. Hook on behalf of In Re AG Processing, Inc. (Hook, April)
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney James G. Powers on behalf of In Re AG Processing, Inc. (Powers, James)
December 16, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
December 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AG Processing, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4076432), by Attorney V. Gene Summerlin, Jr. on behalf of Ricardo Montilla, IV (Attachments: #1 Submission From Sender Brief in Support of Verified Application, #2 Appendix Index of Evidence in Support of Verified Application, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H)(Summerlin, V.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re Montilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: AG Processing, Inc.
Represented By: James G. Powers
Represented By: April N. Hook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Ricardo Montilla, IV
Represented By: V. Gene Summerlin, Jr.
Represented By: Quinn R. Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?