Palmer et al v. A Plus Trucking, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kevin J. Palmer and Christina S. Palmer
Defendant: Shelly L. Lanz, Tanraj Singh Bookher, Garry Mercer Trucking, Inc., Jeffrey A. Clark, Hardinder Singh Bhullar, John V. Lanz, Martin Hotton, A Plus Trucking, LLC, Jose Miguel Figeredo Guillen, Apple Transport LTD, Soler & Soler Hauling Inc., BECO, Inc and Harinder Singh Bhullar
Case Number: 8:2019cv00565
Filed: December 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: John M Gerrard
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2020 Filing 49 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Cameron C. Finke on behalf of Defendant Soler & Soler Hauling Inc..(Finke, Cameron)
February 19, 2020 Filing 48 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Apple Transport LTD. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (KMM)
February 18, 2020 Filing 47 Defendant Apple Transport LTD, Harinder Singh Bhullar and Tanraj Singh Bookher's's ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiff by Tanraj Singh Bookher (Church, Daniel)
February 14, 2020 Filing 46 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 of BECO Incorporated by Attorney William H. Selde on behalf of Cross Claimant BECO, Inc, Defendant BECO, Inc.(Selde, William)
February 14, 2020 Filing 45 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Soler & Soler Hauling Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(CS)
February 14, 2020 Filing 44 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant BECO, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(CS)
February 13, 2020 Filing 43 Clark's ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand and, CROSSCLAIM with jury demand against A Plus Trucking, LLC, Apple Transport LTD, Harinder Singh Bhullar, Tanraj Singh Bookher, Jose Miguel Figeredo Guillen, Garry Mercer Trucking, Inc., Martin Hotton, John V. Lanz, Shelly L. Lanz, Soler & Soler Hauling Inc. regarding Complaint #1 filed by Jason Jeffrey Palmer, Kevin J. Palmer by Jeffrey A. Clark (Selde, William)
February 13, 2020 Filing 42 BECO's ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand and, CROSSCLAIM with jury demand against A Plus Trucking, LLC, Apple Transport LTD, Harinder Singh Bhullar, Tanraj Singh Bookher, Jose Miguel Figeredo Guillen, Garry Mercer Trucking, Inc., Martin Hotton, John V. Lanz, Shelly L. Lanz, Soler & Soler Hauling Inc. regarding Complaint #1 filed by Jason Jeffrey Palmer, Kevin J. Palmer by BECO, Inc (Selde, William)
February 7, 2020 Filing 41 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Shelly L. Lanz on 1/28/2020. (Cullan, Patrick)
February 7, 2020 Filing 40 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant John V. Lanz on 1/28/2020. (Cullan, Patrick)
February 7, 2020 Filing 39 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Jeffrey A. Clark on 1/27/2020. (Cullan, Patrick)
February 7, 2020 Filing 38 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant BECO, Inc on 1/27/2020. (Cullan, Patrick)
February 7, 2020 Filing 37 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant A Plus Trucking, LLC on 1/28/2020. (Cullan, Patrick)
January 31, 2020 Filing 36 Defendants Soler & Soler Hauling Inc.'s and Jose Miguel Figeredo Guillen's ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Apple Transport LTD regarding Complaint #1 filed by Jason Jeffrey Palmer, Kevin J. Palmer by Soler & Soler Hauling Inc. (Tricker, Jennifer)
January 29, 2020 Filing 35 ANSWER to Complaint by Garry Mercer Trucking, Inc., Martin Hotton (Martz, Katherine)
January 28, 2020 Filing 34 Summons Issued as to defendants Apple Transport LTD, Harinder Singh Bhullar, and Tanraj Singh Bookher. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
January 28, 2020 Filing 33 Summons Requested as to Tanraj Singh Bookher regarding Complaint #1 . (Cullan, Patrick)
January 28, 2020 Filing 32 Summons Requested as to Harinder Singh Bhullar regarding Complaint #1 . (Cullan, Patrick)
January 28, 2020 Filing 31 Summons Requested as to Apple Transport LTD regarding Complaint #1 . (Cullan, Patrick)
January 22, 2020 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Soler & Soler Hauling Inc. on 1/13/2020. (Cullan, Patrick)
January 22, 2020 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Jose Miguel Figeredo Guillen on 1/13/2020. (Cullan, Patrick)
January 21, 2020 Filing 28 Summons Issued as to defendants A Plus Trucking, LLC, BECO, Inc, Jeffrey A. Clark. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
January 21, 2020 Filing 27 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to defendant A Plus Trucking, LLC. (Cullan, Patrick)
January 21, 2020 Filing 26 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to defendant Jeffrey A. Clark. (Cullan, Patrick)
January 21, 2020 Filing 25 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to defendant BECO, Inc. (Cullan, Patrick)
January 21, 2020 Filing 24 Summons Requested as to Jeffrey Clark regarding Complaint #1 . (Cullan, Patrick)
January 21, 2020 Filing 23 Summons Requested as to BECO, Inc. regarding Complaint #1 . (Cullan, Patrick)
January 21, 2020 Filing 22 Summons Requested as to A Plus Trucking, LLC regarding Complaint #1 . (Cullan, Patrick)
January 21, 2020 Filing 21 Summons Issued as to defendants A Plus Trucking, LLC, BECO, Inc, Jeffrey A. Clark, John V. Lanz, Shelly L. Lanz. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
January 21, 2020 Filing 20 Summons Requested as to Shelly L. Lanz regarding Complaint #1 . (Cullan, Patrick)
January 21, 2020 Filing 19 Summons Requested as to Jeffrey Clark regarding Complaint #1 . (Cullan, Patrick)
January 21, 2020 Filing 18 Summons Requested as to John V. Lanz regarding Complaint #1 . (Cullan, Patrick)
January 21, 2020 Filing 17 Summons Requested as to Beeco, Inc. regarding Complaint #1 . (Cullan, Patrick)
January 21, 2020 Filing 16 Summons Requested as to A Plus Trucking, LLC regarding Complaint #1 . (Cullan, Patrick)
January 16, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Martin Hotton on 1/8/2020. (Cullan, Patrick)
January 16, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Garry Mercer Trucking, Inc. on 1/8/2020. (Cullan, Patrick)
January 13, 2020 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Bamco, Inc., Corporate Parent Bamco, Inc. for Garry Mercer Trucking, Inc.. by Attorney Katherine Q. Martz on behalf of Defendants Garry Mercer Trucking, Inc., Bamco, Inc., Bamco, Inc..(Martz, Katherine)
January 13, 2020 Filing 12 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Garry Mercer Trucking, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (KMM)
January 10, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to defendants Jose Miguel Figeredo Guillen, Soler & Soler Hauling Inc. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
January 10, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Requested as to Soler & Soler Hauling, Inc. regarding Complaint #1 . (Cullan, Patrick)
January 10, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Requested as to Jose Miguel Figeredo Guillen regarding Complaint #1 . (Cullan, Patrick)
January 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Stephen S. Gealy on behalf of Defendants Garry Mercer Trucking, Inc., Martin Hotton (Gealy, Stephen)
January 9, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Katherine Q. Martz on behalf of Defendants Garry Mercer Trucking, Inc., Martin Hotton (Martz, Katherine)
January 6, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to defendants Garry Mercer Trucking, Inc. and Martin Hotton. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
January 6, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Requested as to Martin Hotton regarding Complaint #1 . (Cullan, Patrick)
January 6, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to Garry Mercer Trucking, Inc. regarding Complaint #1 . (Cullan, Patrick)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REASSIGNMENT ORDER - that this case is reassigned to Chief District Judge John M. Gerrard for disposition and to Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson for judicial supervision. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (LKO)
December 27, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
December 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4082463), by Attorney Patrick J. Cullan on behalf of Christina S. Palmer, Kevin J. Palmer(Cullan, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palmer et al v. A Plus Trucking, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelly L. Lanz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanraj Singh Bookher
Represented By: Julie A. Jorgensen
Represented By: Daniel F. Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garry Mercer Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen S. Gealy
Represented By: Katherine Q. Martz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey A. Clark
Represented By: William H. Selde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hardinder Singh Bhullar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John V. Lanz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Hotton
Represented By: Stephen S. Gealy
Represented By: Katherine Q. Martz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Plus Trucking, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Miguel Figeredo Guillen
Represented By: Cameron C. Finke
Represented By: Jennifer D. Tricker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Transport LTD
Represented By: Julie A. Jorgensen
Represented By: Daniel F. Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soler & Soler Hauling Inc.
Represented By: Cameron C. Finke
Represented By: Jennifer D. Tricker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BECO, Inc
Represented By: William H. Selde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harinder Singh Bhullar
Represented By: Julie A. Jorgensen
Represented By: Daniel F. Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin J. Palmer
Represented By: Patrick J. Cullan
Represented By: Joseph P. Cullan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina S. Palmer
Represented By: Patrick J. Cullan
Represented By: Joseph P. Cullan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?