Belcastro-Gonzalez v. City of Omaha et al
Plaintiff: Katherine Belcastro-Gonzalez
Defendant: City of Omaha, Jean Stothert, Tim Young and Todd Schmaderer
Case Number: 8:2019cv00572
Filed: December 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Susan M Bazis
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall respond to the Motion to Dismiss #14 by March 3, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Attorney Thomas M. White on behalf of Plaintiff Katherine Belcastro-Gonzalez.(White, Thomas)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #14 by Attorney Michelle A. Peters on behalf of Defendants City of Omaha, Todd Schmaderer, Jean Stothert, Tim Young.(Peters, Michelle)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Attorney Michelle A. Peters on behalf of Defendants City of Omaha, Todd Schmaderer, Jean Stothert, Tim Young.(Peters, Michelle)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. The City of Omaha, Todd Schmaderer and Jean Stothert shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by February 12, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Michelle A. Peters on behalf of Defendants City of Omaha, Todd Schmaderer, Jean Stothert.(Peters, Michelle)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Jean Stothert on 1/2/2020. (White, Thomas)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Todd Schmaderer on 1/2/2020. (White, Thomas)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant City of Omaha on 1/2/2020. (White, Thomas)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons Issued as to defendant Tim Young regarding Complaint #1 . YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (JAB)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons Requested as to Tim Young regarding Complaint #1 . (White, Thomas)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to defendants City of Omaha, Todd Schmaderer, and Jean Stothert regarding Complaint #1 . YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (JAB)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Requested as to Todd Schmaderer regarding Complaint #1 . (White, Thomas)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Requested as to Mayor Jean Stothert regarding Complaint #1 . (White, Thomas)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Requested as to City of Omaha regarding Complaint #1 . (White, Thomas)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (JAB)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against City of Omaha Nebraska, Todd Schmaderer, Jean Stothert, Tim Young ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4083724), by Attorney Thomas M. White on behalf of Katherine Belcastro-Gonzalez(White, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Belcastro-Gonzalez v. City of Omaha et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Omaha
Represented By: Michelle A. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Stothert
Represented By: Michelle A. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Young
Represented By: Michelle A. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Schmaderer
Represented By: Michelle A. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Belcastro-Gonzalez
Represented By: Thomas M. White
Represented By: Amy S. Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?