Ali et al v. Brink et al
Plaintiff: Kimberly Reed Ali and Mi'Te Pharu El
Defendant: M&T Bank, Kevin J. Pearson, SouthLaw P.C. and Edward E. Brink
Case Number: 8:2020cv00023
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
2 Judge: Richard G Kopf
3 Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 JUDGMENT - PRO SE: Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Declaratory Relief, ECF No. 8, is denied; Plaintiffs' pro se Civil Complaint, ECF No. 1, is dismissed, without prejudice; and The Clerk shall mail a copy of this Judgment to the pro se Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Notice - Civil Appeals in Pro Se Cases) Ordered by Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (ADB)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Declaratory Relief, ECF No. #8 , is denied; Plaintiffs' pro se Civil Complaint, ECF No. 1, is dismissed, without prejudice; The Clerk shall mail a copy of this Order to the pro se Plaintiffs; and A separate judgment will be entered. Ordered by Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ADB)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REASSIGNMENT ORDER - that this case is reassigned to Senior District Judge Laurie Smith Camp for disposition and to Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart for judicial supervision. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER - The filing fee has been paid in this case. At the direction of the Court, this case is removed from the pro se docket. The clerk's office shall randomly assign new judges to this case and request a reassignment order from the Chief Judge. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO)
January 29, 2020 Filing 9 Addendum on behalf of Plaintiff Mi'Te Pharu El.(TCL)
January 29, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for TRO Injunction and Declaratory Relief on behalf of Plaintiffs Kimberly Reed Ali, Mi'Te Pharu El.(TCL)
January 29, 2020 FILING FEE PAID on behalf of Plaintiff Mi'Te Pharu El. Receipt number 8055012, in the amount of $ 400.00. (LRM)
January 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Pendency of Action on behalf of Plaintiff Kimberly Reed Ali. (LKO)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff is directed to submit the $400.00 fees to the clerk's office or submit a request to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days. Failure to take either action will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. The clerk of the court is directed to send to Plaintiff the Form AO240 ("Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit"). The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: February 24, 2020: Check for MIFP or payment. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's "Application to Proceed in District Court Pro Bono Without Prepaying Fees or Cost" (filing no. #2 ) is denied without prejudice to reassertion in a motion to proceed in forma pauperis that complies with 28 U.S.C. 1915. Plaintiff is directed to submit the $400.00 fees to the clerk's office or submit a request to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days. Failure to take either action will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. The clerk of the court is directed to send to Plaintiff the Form AO240 ("Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit"). The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: February 24, 2020: Check for MIFP or payment. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 GENERAL ORDER NO. 2016-02: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO)
January 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se parties) (LKO)
January 15, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Mi'Te Pharu El. (LKO)
January 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Edward E. Brink, M&T Bank, Kevin J. Pearson, and SouthLaw P.C. filed on behalf of pro se plaintiff's Kimberly Reed Ali and Mi'Te Pharu El. (LKO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ali et al v. Brink et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Reed Ali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mi'Te Pharu El
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M&T Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin J. Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SouthLaw P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward E. Brink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?